California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 4:23-cv-04739
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Hapag-Lloyd AG
Represented By
John D. Giffin
Keesal Young & Logan
contact info
Plaintiff
Ralph Stanley Cooper
Represented By
Philip Ross Weltin
Weltin Streb & Weltin, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/19 5:12 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ralph Stanley Cooper.. (Weltin, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 09/15 1:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Hapag-Lloyd AG. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/15 1:00 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 9:46 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/14 5:13 PM
Proposed Summons. (Weltin, Philip)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Hapag-Lloyd AG ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18645701.). Filed byRalph Stanley Cooper.(Weltin, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet