California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:23-cv-04742
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Neal M Glazer
London Fischer LLP
contact info
Peter Michael Mularczyk
London Fischer
contact info
Elizabeth L. Musser
London Fischer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mountain View Owner, LLC
Represented By
Jamie B. Jefferson
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
R. Morgan Gilhuly
Barg Coffin Lewis & Trapp, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 04/23 5:09 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Mountain View Owner, LLC. (Gilhuly, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/01 7:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation to Continue. Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2024, is continued to 4/24/2024, at 10:00 AM by telephone, with dismissal or joint update due 4/24/2024. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 02/01 3:03 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Notice of Settlement in Principle; Stipulation and Order to Continue March 6, 2024 Case Management Conference filed by Mountain View Owner, LLC. (Gilhuly, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 12/05 7:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Deadlines. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2023, is continued to 3/6/2024, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2024. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 12/05 8:54 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company.. (Glazer, Neal)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 12/04 6:38 PM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendant is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
19 19 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 11/22 12:57 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jefferson, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 11/21 4:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendant is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 11/28/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/21 3:23 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES TO PURSUE MEDIATION filed by Mountain View Owner, LLC. (Gilhuly, R.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/20 2:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING 14 Application for Admission of Attorney Neal M. Glazer Pro Hac Vice representing Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 11/17 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Elizabeth L. Musser (Musser, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/17 10:07 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - NEAL M. GLAZER - APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18847128.) filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Glazer, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 11/09 4:27 PM
ORDER granting 12 Stipulation to extend time for Defendant to respond to initial complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 11/09 1:00 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Mularczyk, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
11 11 order Order on Stipulation Mon 10/09 5:18 PM
Order granting 10 Stipulation extending time to file response to complaint, entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 10/09 1:47 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company and Mountain View Owner, LLC. (Mularczyk, Peter) Modified on 10/10/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 10/09 1:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ironshore Speciality Insurance Company for Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Mularczyk, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 10:52 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mountain View Owner, LLC.. (Gilhuly, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/21 12:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mountain View Owner, LLC. Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Gilhuly, R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/15 1:38 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 09/15 1:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 8:54 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/14 5:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Mountain View Owner, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mountain View Mezz, LLC, Corporate Parent CDCF III Fortbay MV, LLC, Corporate Parent GS Village Lake LLC, Corporate Parent GS Miramar Village Lakes Manager LLC, Corporate Parent Miramar - Village Lakes GP, LLC, Corporate Parent Miramar Village Lakes GP Manager, LLC, Corporate Parent Miramar Investors, Corporate Parent 777 WMF, LLC, Corporate Parent GS Engineering and Construction Corp. for Mountain View Owner, LLC. CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICTS AND INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Gilhuly, R.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/14 5:09 PM
Proposed Summons. (Gilhuly, R.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT against Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18645811.). Filed byMountain View Owner, LLC.(Gilhuly, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet