New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Referred: Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:23-cv-06784
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 7:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Trader Joe's Company
Represented By
Justin Anthony Guilfoyle
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Julia Hammer
Represented By
Hilary Joy Orzick
Crumiller P.C.
contact info
Olivia Davis
Crumiller P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 01/06 11:02 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint letter (ECF No.35 ) informing of a settlement in principle. Accordingly, the case is to be closed, subject to reopening within 60 days if the settlement is not consummated. All conferences are adjourned, including the January 7, 2025 Final Conference before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay and the January 21, 2025 Pre-Motion Conference before Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/6/2025. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
35 35 misc Letter Fri 01/03 5:26 PM
Letter re: Matter Resolved and Request to Adjourn the Final Conference Scheduled for January 7, 2025 and the Pre-Motion Conference Scheduled for January 21, 2025 by Trader Joe's Company (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/20 4:53 PM
ORDER granting28 and29 , the parties' Motions for Pre Motion Conference. Pre Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Ordered by Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 12/20/2024. (EAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 12/19 12:28 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joan M. Azrack recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceeding. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/17/2024. (LC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
33 33 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Fri 12/13 3:19 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order by Julia Hammer (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 11/27 1:04 PM
ORDER granting32 : The deadline to submit the proposed joint pretrial order is extended to and including December 13, 2024. The December 5, 2024 conference is adjourned to January 7, 2025 at 12:00 PM. Conference call instructions will be provided in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/27/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 11/26 5:27 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by Trader Joe's Company. (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
31 31 respm Response to Motion Wed 11/13 7:44 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re28 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Summary Judgment filed by Trader Joe's Company. (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Response to Motion Wed 11/13 6:30 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re29 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Julia Hammer. (Pierre-Louis, Travis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
29 29 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 11/06 6:27 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Motion for Summary Judgment by Trader Joe's Company. (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 11/06 5:23 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Summary Judgment by Julia Hammer. (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
order Order(Other) Fri 10/25 1:35 PM
ORDER re27 : The request to adjourn the deadline for submission of the joint pretrial order until a date after decision on the anticipated summary judgment motion is denied. The undersigned believes that the joint pretrial order should be prepared soon after the close of discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/25/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
27 27 misc Letter Thu 10/24 11:21 AM
Letter re Scheduling Order by Julia Hammer (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Pierre-Louis on behalf of Julia Hammer (aty to be noticed) (Pierre-Louis, Travis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
order Scheduling Order Fri 10/11 11:46 AM
ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar the December 3, 2024, conference is adjourned to December 5, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. Conference call instructions will be provided in advance of the conference date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/11/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/13 2:52 PM
ORDER re25 : The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, to be concluded by October 9, 2024. Any party planning on making a dispositive motion must take the first step in the motion process by November 6, 2024. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, on or before December 2, 2024, 2024. The November 12, 2024 final conference is adjourned to December 3, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. Conference call instructions will be provided in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/13/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 09/12 6:16 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Julia Hammer. (Orzick, Hilary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 08/21 7:43 PM
ORDER23 : The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, to be concluded by September 15, 2024. Any party planning on making a dispositive motion must take the first step in the motion process by October 11, 2024. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, on or before November 7, 2024. The October 8, 2024 final conference is adjourned to November 12, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. Conference call instructions will be provided in advance of the conference.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/21/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Tue 08/13 5:52 PM
Letter Response to Plaintiff's Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Trader Joe's Company (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 08/09 12:35 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Julia Hammer. (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/29 2:06 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint by Trader Joe's Company. (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/15 1:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Trader Joe's Company, filed by Julia Hammer. (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 03/15 1:07 PM
ORDER re20 : The motion for leave to file an amended complaint, on consent, is granted. The plaintiff is directed to serve and file the amended complaint upon receipt of this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/15/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Thu 03/14 10:52 AM
Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Complaint by Julia Hammer. (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Redlined Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Amended Complaint
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 02/14 3:12 PM
Document15 is terminated as moot. (RI)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 02/14 3:14 PM
ORDER granting19 : The Joint Proposed Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/14/2024. c/ecf (DM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
19 19 motion Protective Order Wed 01/31 6:17 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Julia Hammer. (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/25 12:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Final Conference is scheduled for October 8, 2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. See the attached Order for details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/25/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Scheduling Conference Telephone Conference Thu 01/25 12:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/25/2024. The parties Meeting Plan is approved. A scheduling Order will be entered under a separate Order. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Thu 01/18 5:23 PM
Letter Response to Plaintiff's Letter Motion to Compel dated January 12, 2024 by Trader Joe's Company (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
15 15 motion Compel Fri 01/12 1:53 PM
Letter MOTION to Compel by Julia Hammer. (Orzick, Hilary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs Proposed ESI Protocol,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants Proposed ESI Protocol
Friday, January 05, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 01/05 2:44 PM
ORDER re14 : The January 17, 2024 conference is adjourned to January 25, 2024 at 11:30 AM. The Court will initiate the conference call. The parties are directed to dial (888) 278-0296 prior to the scheduled time to access the call center. At the prompt enter access code 9424335. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/5/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
14 14 motion Adjourn Conference Extension of Time to File Document Thu 01/04 7:03 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference 16(b) Conference , Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Disputes Related to ESI Search by Julia Hammer. (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
order Scheduling Order Tue 12/19 2:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for January 17, 2024 at 1:45 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the conference call. The parties are directed to dial (888) 278-0296 prior to the scheduled time to access the call center. At the prompt enter access code 9424335. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/19/2023. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 12/18 4:35 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/01 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Davis on behalf of Julia Hammer (aty to be noticed) (Davis, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/17 3:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by December 18, 2023. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/17/2023. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26(f) form
Monday, November 13, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/13 5:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trader Joe's Company identifying Corporate Parent T.A.C.T. Holding, Inc. for Trader Joe's Company. (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/13 5:47 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Trader Joe's Company. (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/13 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Anthony Guilfoyle on behalf of Trader Joe's Company (aty to be noticed) (Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/18 5:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julia Hammer. Trader Joe's Company waiver sent on 9/12/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Orzick, Hilary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 09/15 1:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Trader Joe's Company. (CL)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 09/15 1:34 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/15 1:34 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 09/14 4:48 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 Proposed Summons. by Julia Hammer (Orzick, Hilary)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Julia Hammer (Orzick, Hilary)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Trader Joe's Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17077284 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Julia Hammer. (Orzick, Hilary)
Related: [-]