Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bianca M Rucker
Case #: 4:23-bk-12871
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Oct 16, 2023

Debtor
Wright's Cabinets Inc.
PO Box 667
Jacksonville, AR 72078
Represented By
Michael J. Knollmeyer
Knollmeyer Law Office
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Hamilton M Mitchell
Chapter 7 Panel Trustee Teleconf 877-915-4975 code1176945 1204 N. Polk St
Little Rock, AR 72205
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 09/15/2023 12:36 AM CDT
Thursday, September 14, 2023
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 09/14 4:20 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Wright's Cabinets Inc.. (Knollmeyer, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Receipt (Auto) Thu 09/14 4:37 PM
RECEIPT of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:4:23-bk-12871] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. receipt number A15827540, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Thu 09/14 5:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM at Chapter 7 341a Telephonic Meeting. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment)
Related: [-]