Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:23-cr-01296
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Last checked: Friday Sep 15, 2023 2:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino (1)
Represented By
Ricardo Montalvo
Law Office Of Rick Montalvo, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Roberto Lopez, Jr.
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/15/2023 3:23 AM CDT
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
Arrest of Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino, filed. (SandraSilva, 7) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 8/31/2023 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (SandraSilva, 7) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Criminal Complaint as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino held on 8/31/2023. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Next attorney on the CJA panel will be appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Government moved for temporary detention and continuance to prepare for detention hearing. Court granted. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 9/5/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Jose A Garcia, AUSA. (USPO: Daniel Canchola) (ERO: Yesenia Ibarra) (Interpreter: Steve Mines and Monica Rossler, used) (DUSM: Mayra Buban). (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Roberto Lopez, Jr appearing for USA, filed.(Lopez, Roberto) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino, filed.(SandraSilva, 7) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino. Ricardo Montalvo appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearings as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 9/5/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino, filed. [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
6 6 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (JessicaAlvarez, 7) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION AND DETENTION HEARING as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino held on 09/05/2023. Defendant was present in the courtroom. Defendant, with the assistance of counsel, waived the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court found probable cause. Regarding bond, the Government requested detention. The Court took judicial notice of the Pretrial Report (Dkt. No. 6) and entered findings. The Court denied bond, a written Order of Detention Pending Trial to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Robert Lopez, Jr., AUSA; Ricardo Montalvo, CJA Attorney. (ERO: Yesenia Ibarra) (Interpreter: Steve Mines and Maria E. Barrett, used) (USPO: Ana Melara) (DUSM: Tommy Ayala), filed. (jhacker). Modified on 9/5/2023 (jhacker, ).[7:23-mj-01527] Modified on 9/14/2023 (jhacker, ).
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino ( Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (StephanieGarcia, 7) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino ( Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (OmarOrta, 7) [7:23-mj-01527]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
9 9 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino (1) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (ChrisBarrera, 7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
10 10 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino, filed.(ChrisBarrera, 7) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/14/2023) (ChrisBarrera, 7).
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Julio Cesar Pena-Trevino. Arraignment set for 9/21/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano, filed. (ChrisBarrera, 7)
Related: [-]