California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:23-cv-04675
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Danielle Lehman
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Shengnan LI
1159 King Ct.
El Cerrito, CA 94530


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 02/27 2:34 PM
STIPULATION Parties' Stipulation to Dismiss filed by Danielle Lehman. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/20 2:52 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation to Stay Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 9 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11/20 12:15 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; [Proposed] Order filed by Danielle Lehman. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/20 12:13 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Danielle Lehman.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 11/01 4:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shengnan LI. Danielle Lehman and United States served on 9/19/2023, answer due 11/20/2023.(ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 26, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 10/26 2:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shengnan LI. Danielle Lehman served on 9/21/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/22 4:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shengnan LI.. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 09/14 1:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Danielle Lehman. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Thu 09/14 1:06 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (msr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Thu 09/14 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus ( Filing fee $402 ). Filed byShengnan LI.(msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt $402