California Northern District Court
Judge:Maxine M Chesney
Case #: 3:23-cv-04685
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Guardian Technologies LLC
Represented By
Daniel Thomas Rockey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lasko Products LLC
Represented By
Daniel Thomas Rockey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Felice
Represented By
Peter J. Farnese
Farnese P.C.
contact info
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Gregory Marc Sinderbrand
Borba LLC
contact info
Luke Sironski-White
Bursor And Fisher P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Garfield
Represented By
Peter J. Farnese
Farnese P.C.
contact info
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Gregory Marc Sinderbrand
Borba LLC
contact info
Luke Sironski-White
Bursor And Fisher P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Poston
Represented By
Peter J. Farnese
Farnese P.C.
contact info
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Gregory Marc Sinderbrand
Borba LLC
contact info
Luke Sironski-White
Bursor And Fisher P.A.
contact info

GPO Feb 14 2024
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 14, 2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2024)
GPO Apr 04 2024
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/4/2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
GPO Jul 30 2024
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DENYING LEAVE TO AMEND Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 30, 2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
48 48 appeal USCA Order Wed 01/29 10:09 AM
ORDER of USCA No. 24-5261 (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
47 47 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 08/27 5:35 PM
USCA Case Number 24-5255 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for46 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Nicholas Poston, Lisa Felice, Justin Garfield. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
46 46 appeal Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Fri 08/23 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Lisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston. (Appeal fee of $605 receipt number ACANDC-19767226 paid.) (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
45 45 oth_evt Judgment - Clerk Wed 07/31 11:40 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Defendants motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and the First Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without further leave to amend. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
44 44 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 07/30 3:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DENYING LEAVE TO AMEND Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 30, 2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
43 43 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/17 9:09 AM
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 17, 2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF Fri 07/05 9:22 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities . Motion Hearing reset to 7/26/2024 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
42 42 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 07/03 5:28 PM
ORDER REGARDING HEARING ONDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 3, 2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
41 41 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 07/02 4:58 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Lisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
40 40 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 07/02 1:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - CONVERTING THE AUGUST 23, 2024 AT 10:30 AM - FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Further Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,.(tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
39 39 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 06/27 4:55 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byGuardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. (Rockey, Daniel)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Thursday, June 06, 2024
38 38 23 pgs respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 06/06 5:43 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byLisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Monday, May 20, 2024
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF Mon 05/20 8:44 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities . Opposition due by 6/6/2024. Reply due by 6/27/2024. Motion Hearing reset to 7/19/2024 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
37 37 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 05/17 4:55 PM
ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 05/17 12:39 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Lisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
35 35 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Thu 05/09 1:33 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byGuardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. Related [+] (Rockey, Daniel)
Related: [-] 34
34 34 31 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 05/09 1:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Guardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/21/2024 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Responses due by 5/23/2024. Replies due by 5/30/2024.(Rockey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
Friday, May 03, 2024
33 33 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/03 11:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Initial Case Management Conference held by Zoom on 5/3/2024. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Digital Recording Time: 10:49 - 11:02 - Zoom Recording. Plaintiff Attorney: Luke Sironski-White. Defendant Attorney: Merrit Jones. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
32 32 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 04/26 3:19 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
31 31 31 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/25 12:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against Guardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. Filed by Lisa Felice, Nicholas Poston, Justin Garfield. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
30 30 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 04/04 12:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/4/2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 04/04 11:10 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - CONVERTING THE MAY 3, 2024 AT 10:30 AM - INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,.(tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
28 28 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 03/19 10:03 AM
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MAY 3, 2024 AT 10:30 A.M. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Tue 03/19 10:15 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re28 Order on Stipulation Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 5/3/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
27 27 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 03/18 4:21 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Guardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. (Jones, Merrit)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/14 3:50 PM
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 14, 2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 02/14 1:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING THE MARCH 29, 2024 AT 10:30 AM - INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,.(tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
24 24 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 02/02 4:12 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byGuardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. (Rockey, Daniel)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Dismiss -- Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and FRCP 12(b)(1), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/24 5:06 PM
SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT COURTESY COPIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 24, 2024. (mmclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
22 22 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 01/19 5:09 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byLisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Dismiss -- Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and FRCP 12(b)(1), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/17 5:19 PM
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT COURTESY COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 17, 2024. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
20 20 order ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Thu 12/28 12:02 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 28, 2023. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Thu 12/28 2:57 PM
Reset Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss -- Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and FRCP 12(b)(1), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities ,20 Terminate Motions, Order., Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re20 Terminate Motions, Order Responses due by 1/19/2024. Replies due by 2/2/2024. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2024 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2024 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
19 19 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 12/26 1:45 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Lisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 12/15 6:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lasko Operation Holdings, LLC for Guardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. (Rockey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
17 17 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 12/15 6:04 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re16 MOTION to Dismiss -- Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and FRCP 12(b)(1), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byGuardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. Related [+] (Rockey, Daniel)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 motion Dismiss Fri 12/15 6:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss -- Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and FRCP 12(b)(1), and to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Guardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/19/2024 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Responses due by 12/29/2023. Replies due by 1/5/2024.(Rockey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
15 15 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 12/12 5:29 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sironski-White, Luke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Tue 12/05 11:57 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re14 Order, Terminate Motions Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2024. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 2/23/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
14 14 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 12/04 5:49 PM
ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 15, 2023, to February 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 4, 2023. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 12/04 4:35 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Management Conference filed by Lisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 11/15 3:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING THE DECEMBER 15, 2023 - INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,.(tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 10/30 4:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston re9 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Sironski-White, Luke)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/30 4:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lisa Felice, Nicholas Poston, Justin Garfield. Service waived by Guardian Technologies LLC waiver sent on 10/16/2023, answer due 12/15/2023; Lasko Products LLC waiver sent on 10/16/2023, answer due 12/15/2023. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
9 9 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 09/14 4:51 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:< Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/14/2023. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/14 10:56 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 9/14/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
7 7 Summons Issued as to Guardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Felice, Justin Garfield, Nicholas Poston.. (Sironski-White, Luke)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Guardian Technologies LLC, Lasko Products LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18637104.). Filed byLisa Felice, Nicholas Poston, Justin Garfield.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet