California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:23-cv-04707
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Lannatt Rodrigous
Defendant
Matt Rodriguous
Defendant
Zack Rodrigous
Defendant
Tina Rodrigous
Defendant
Tazz Rodrigous
Defendant
Steve Rodrigous
Defendant
Shawn Rodrigous
Defendant
Scott Rodrigous
Defendant
Samatha Rodrigous
Defendant
Predo Rodrigous
Defendant
Paul Rodrigous
Defendant
Miley Rodrigous
Defendant
Marly Rodrigous
Defendant
Mark Rodrigous
Defendant
Kertal Rodrigous
Defendant
Herly Rodrigous
Defendant
Carline Rodrigous
Defendant
Mark Rentals
Defendant
Steven Rains
Defendant
Brandy Rains
Defendant
Todd Polocas
Defendant
Mike Oshso
Defendant
Merria Oshso
Defendant
Alessio Larrabee
Defendant
Billy Forloss
Plaintiff
Clyde Armstrong
615 Manahan Ct
Red Bluff, CA 96080

GPO Aug 20 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/20/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
40 40 misc Letter Fri 11/15 12:01 PM
Letter from Clyde Armstrong. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, August 23, 2024
39 39 oth_evt Judgment - Clerk Fri 08/23 4:01 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
38 38 misc Received Document Fri 08/23 3:13 PM
Received Document by Clyde Armstrong.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Envelope
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/20 4:36 PM
ORDER ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/20/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
36 36 misc Letter Tue 08/20 10:16 AM
Letter from Clyde Armstrong. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
35 35 misc Letter Tue 08/06 4:47 PM
Letter from Clyde Armstrong. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, July 26, 2024
34 34 misc Letter Fri 07/26 11:39 AM
Letter from Plaintiff Clyde Armstrong dated 7/21/2024.(shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
33 33 misc Letter Fri 07/26 11:28 AM
Letter from Plaintiff Clyde Armstrong dated July 7, 2024. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/19 12:38 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/19/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, July 18, 2024
31 31 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 07/18 4:21 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Objections due by 8/1/2024. (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Tue 07/02 12:17 PM
Letter by Plaintiff dated 6/23/2024. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
29 29 misc Letter Tue 06/25 12:18 PM
Letter by Plaintiff dated 6/10/2024. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Letter Tue 06/25 12:17 PM
Letter by Plaintiff dated 5/27/2024. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
27 27 misc Letter Wed 05/15 12:18 PM
Letter by Plaintiff dated April 14, 2024.(shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
26 26 misc Letter Wed 05/15 12:17 PM
Letter by Plaintiff dated April 1, 2024. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Letter Wed 05/15 12:16 PM
Letter by Plaintiff dated March 3, 2024.(shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Monday, May 06, 2024
24 24 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Wed 05/08 8:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Clyde Armstrong. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/08 8:30 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Billy Forloss, Alessio Larrabee, Merria Oshso, Mike Oshso, Todd Polocas, Brandy Rains, Steven Rains, Mark Rentals, Carline Rodrigous, Herly Rodrigous, Kertal Rodrigous, Lannatt Rodrigous, Mark Rodrigous, Marly Rodrigous, Miley Rodrigous, Paul Rodrigous, Predo Rodrigous, Samatha Rodrigous, Scott Rodrigous, Shawn Rodrigous, Steve Rodrigous, Tazz Rodrigous, Tina Rodrigous, Zack Rodrigous, Matt Rodriguous. Filed by Clyde Armstrong. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/24 6:30 PM
SCREENING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Wed 03/27 1:15 PM
Letter dated 3/17/2024 from Clyde Armstrong. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, March 01, 2024
20 20 misc Letter Fri 03/01 12:18 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Clyde Armstrong dated 2/19/2024. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Tue 02/13 12:10 PM
Letter dated 2/5/2024 from Clyde Armstrong. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, February 01, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Mon 02/05 9:05 AM
Letter dated 1/21/2024 from Clyde Armstrong. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 01/17 9:42 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties are hereby notified that the initial case management conference is vacated and removed from Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tses January 19, 2024 calendar. The Court shall reschedule the case management conference at a later time, if needed (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Letter Wed 01/17 9:41 AM
Letter dated 1/8/2024 from Clyde Armstrong. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 29, 2023
15 15 misc Letter Fri 12/29 3:27 PM
Letter from Clyde Armstrong. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
14 14 misc Letter Mon 12/18 3:37 PM
Letter from Clyde Armstrong. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Letter Mon 12/18 3:36 PM
Letter from Clyde Armstrong. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 12/12 9:04 AM
CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 1/19/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/tse-alex-g-agt/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
11 11 misc Letter Mon 12/11 1:47 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Clyde Armstrong dated 11/13/2023.(shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
10 10 misc Letter Mon 12/11 1:40 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Clyde Armstrong dated 10/31/2023.(shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
9 9 misc Letter Wed 10/25 2:01 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Clyde Armstrong. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/11 2:42 PM
ORDER Re: Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Fri 10/06 3:09 PM
Letter from Clyde Armstrong. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/28 11:35 PM
NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons by Clyde Armstrong (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/28 11:33 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Clyde Armstrong. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/28 11:32 PM
NOTICE of Waiver of the Service of Summons by Clyde Armstrong (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/14 8:01 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/14 7:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Clyde Armstrong. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 7:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Billy Forloss, Alessio Larrabee, Merria Oshso, Mike Oshso, Todd Polocas, Brandy Rains, Steven Rains, Mark Rentals, Carline Rodrigous, Herly Rodrigous, Kertal Rodrigous, Lannatt Rodrigous, Mark Rodrigous, Marly Rodrigous, Miley Rodrigous, Paul Rodrigous, Predo Rodrigous, Samatha Rodrigous, Scott Rodrigous, Shawn Rodrigous, Steve Rodrigous, Tazz Rodrigous, Tina Rodrigous, Zack Rodrigous, Matt Rodriguous (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Clyde Armstrong. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2023. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope