California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:23-cv-04708
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 25, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/25 11:46 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation to Plaintiff's Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 20 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
20 20 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 10/23 3:23 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS filed by Johnny Raynard Johnson.(Pluimer, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fee Agreement and Assignment of Fees Under EAJA
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 order Judgment Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/19 4:28 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, ***Civil Case Terminated. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 09/19 2:27 PM
ORDER Resolving Claim for Review by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse.(shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 02/16 3:30 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byJohnny Raynard Johnson.(Pluimer, Meghan)
Related: [-] 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 12, 2024
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Mon 02/12 2:02 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Martin J. O'Malley. Responses due by 2/26/2024. (Highland, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 01/11 11:13 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for an Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 14 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 01/08 9:05 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time filed by Martin O'Malley. (Highland, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Wed 01/03 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Erin Highland Terminating Oscar Gonzalez de Llano (Highland, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Tue 12/12 3:25 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johnny Raynard Johnson. Responses due by 1/11/2024. Replies due by 1/25/2024. (Pluimer, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
11 11 misc SSA Administrative Transcript Wed 11/15 3:24 PM
SSA Administrative Transcript Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Certified Administrative Record in Electronic Form by Kilolo Kijakazi.(Lo, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 1,
Att: 2 Part 2,
Att: 3 Part 3,
Att: 4 Part 4,
Att: 5 Part 5,
Att: 6 Part 6,
Att: 7 Part 7,
Att: 8 Part 8
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/31 10:36 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 9 Amended Application. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/27 12:52 PM
Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Johnny Raynard Johnson.(Pluimer, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/17 1:03 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/11 2:51 PM
ORDER Regarding Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: Regarding 2 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Rubinstein (Rubinstein, Ann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
5 5 order Social Security Procedural Order Thu 09/14 9:11 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/14 9:00 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Johnny Raynard Johnson.. (Pluimer, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Johnny Raynard Johnson. (Pluimer, Meghan)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi. Filed byJohnny Raynard Johnson.(Pluimer, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet