California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-04715
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
The GAP, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Duffy
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Efren Ramos
Represented By
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 18, 2023
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 12/18 4:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judg. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 12/18 3:02 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The GAP, Inc... (Duffy, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
9 9 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 12/07 10:35 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 8 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
8 8 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 12/06 2:13 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES filed by The GAP, Inc.. (Duffy, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 12/06 2:07 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by The GAP, Inc.. (Duffy, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/21 9:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Efren Ramos. The GAP, Inc. served on 11/17/2023, answer due 12/8/2023. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 09/14 10:05 AM
Summons Issued as to The GAP, Inc.. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/14 10:02 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/14 8:23 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against The GAP, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18641529.). Filed byEfren Ramos.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet