California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04745
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
1515 3rd Street
San Francisco, CA 94158
Represented By
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
1515 3rd St.
San Francisco, CA 94158
Represented By
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Cormier
Represented By
Rachel Beth Abrams
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane Conway & Wise
contact info

GPO Oct 20 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-4308 AMO, 23-cv-4705 AMO, 23-cv-4745 AMO, and 23-cv-3949 AMO. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 10/20/2023. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/21 12:42 PM
FIRST AMENDED SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - First Amended Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Joshua Cormier. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/09 9:58 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Joshua Cormier. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/24 10:42 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Monday, October 23, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Mon 10/23 9:36 AM
ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/23/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Mon 10/23 4:22 PM
MEMBER CASE MDL 3084: 3:23-cv-04745-CRB Cormier v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al pursuant to Order Relating Cases (Docket 22 in 23-md-3084-CRB) cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
20 20 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Fri 10/20 2:54 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-4308 AMO, 23-cv-4705 AMO, 23-cv-4745 AMO, and 23-cv-3949 AMO. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 10/20/2023. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
19 19 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/03 4:02 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND RASIER, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/03 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colton Parks (Parks, Colton)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/03 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Quinn Schleier (Schleier, Samuel)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 10/03 10:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/03 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Augusto Alarcon (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 10/03 8:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Cormier re7 Summons Issued (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Mon 09/25 2:45 PM
Notice of Related Actions Filed in MDL 3084 In re: Uber Technologies, Inc. Passenger Sexual Assault Litigation. (Rule 6.2(d) of the Rules of Procedure for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation). (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 09/19 3:47 PM
Clerk's Notice Scheduling Case Management Conference. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] . Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/19 11:19 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/19/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 09/19 10:46 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/19/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/19 10:37 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 09/19/2023.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Monday, September 18, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 09/18 12:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 11:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 10:46 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/15 9:47 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joshua Cormier.. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 9:36 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 8:04 AM
Proposed Summons. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 09/15 8:03 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Joshua Cormier (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
1 1 49 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 8:03 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18646494.). Filed byJoshua Cormier.(Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet