California Northern District Court
Judge:Peter H Kang
Case #: 3:23-cv-04750
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Emelia Bardini
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
USCIS
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Dengbin Qiao
330 Berry Street Unit 404
San Francisco, CA 94158
Represented By
Mei Zhou
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 25, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/25 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Dengbin Qiao by Dengbin Qiao (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
14 14 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Tue 11/28 9:39 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/27 11:11 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang granting 12 Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline. (phklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 11/22 4:26 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANTS MUST FILE A RESPONSE AND TO ISSUANCE OF GENERAL ORDER NO. 61; filed by Emelia Bardini, Department of Homeland Security, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 11/22 4:24 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Emelia Bardini, Department of Homeland Security, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, USCIS.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/22 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 12:31 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dengbin Qiao.. (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 09/20 11:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dengbin Qiao Zhou, Mei (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 11:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Emelia Bardini, Department of Homeland Security, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, USCIS. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 16, 2023
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Sat 09/16 10:31 AM
Proposed Summons. (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 9:52 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 9:37 AM
Proposed Summons. (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 9:36 AM
Proposed Summons. (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/15 9:35 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by DENGBIN QIAO Zhou, Mei . (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT Dengbin Qiao against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18646922.). Filed byDENGBIN QIAO.(Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix I 589 receipt,
Att: 2 Appendix Proof of Jurisdiction
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 09/15 1:48 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Submit one summons for all defendants. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:3 Proposed Summons filed by Dengbin Qiao,4 Proposed Summons filed by Dengbin Qiao (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]