California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 4:23-cv-04744
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
1515 3rd Street
San Francisco, CA 94158
Represented By
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
1515 3rd St.
San Francisco, CA 94158
Represented By
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
E. E.
Represented By
Rachel Beth Abrams
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane Conway & Wise
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 12, 2023
23 23 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Thu 10/12 12:24 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Re 23-md-03084-CRB. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/12/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
22 22 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/03 3:50 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND RASIER, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colton Parks (Parks, Colton)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Quinn Schleier (Schleier, Samuel)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 09/27 5:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Augusto Alarcon (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
17 17 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 09/26 9:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by E. E. re7 Summons Issued (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Mon 09/25 2:44 PM
Notice of Related Actions Filed in MDL 3084 In re: Uber Technologies, Inc. Passenger Sexual Assault Litigation. (Rule 6.2(d) of the Rules of Procedure for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation). (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 09/22 6:39 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Telephonic Case Management Conference, previously set for September 26, 2023, is continued to October 24, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. The dial-in information and instructions remain the same as previously provided in docket no. 14 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Wed 09/20 10:21 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for September 26, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. The September 26, 2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Wed 09/20 8:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for December 19, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by December 12th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:23-cv-04744-HSG. The December 19, 2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/19 9:51 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 9/19/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 09/19 9:31 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/19/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/19 9:04 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 9/19/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Monday, September 18, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 09/18 5:33 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/15 11:56 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 09/15 11:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/15 9:32 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by E. E... (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 8:18 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 7:53 AM
Proposed Summons. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 09/15 7:52 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by E. E. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Protective Order Fri 09/15 7:52 AM
MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously; Memorandum of Law in Support filed by E. E.. Responses due by 9/29/2023.(Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 49 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 7:51 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18646449.). Filed byE. E..(Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet