Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Schmehl
Case #: 5:23-cv-03581
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sexual Harassment)
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 12:47 PM EDT
Defendant
PRIZER-PAINTER STOVE WORKS, INC.
Represented By
KRISTIN BERGER PARKER
Jones Day - Minneapolis
contact info
KATHERINE J. MCLAY
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNAVER SCAFFIDI
Represented By
BENJAMIN DAVID SALVINA
Marzzacco Niven & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 01/10 11:15 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/10/24. 1/10/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
9 9 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/10 8:10 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW Settlement Conference held on 1/9/24. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 10/23 4:40 PM
ORDER THAT THE5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/23/23.10/23/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/23 1:55 PM
ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/9/2024 01:00 PM IN Courtroom 3G. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 10/23/23. 10/23/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
6 6 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/20 2:48 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Uncontested, Fee Previously Paid) of Kristin Berger Parker by PRIZER-PAINTER STOVE WORKS, INC... (MCLAY, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 10/20 2:47 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Uncontested) ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17022504.) filed by PRIZER-PAINTER STOVE WORKS, INC..Certificate of Counsel.(MCLAY, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 19, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/19 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE J. MCLAY on behalf of PRIZER-PAINTER STOVE WORKS, INC. (MCLAY, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 10/18 8:43 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE CASE IS STAYED FOR 90 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/17/23. 10/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/15 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to PRIZER-PAINTER STOVE WORKS, INC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/15/23 (er)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 09/15 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT against PRIZER-PAINTER STOVE WORKS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16947047.), filed by JENNAVER SCAFFIDI.(SALVINA, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form