Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Referred: Bill Davis
Case #: 4:23-cv-00822
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 4:53 AM CDT
Defendant
CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Thomas Turner
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, Pc - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry L. Cunningham
Represented By
Christine Ann Hopkins
Tremain Artaza PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Monday, January 13, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Mon 01/13 11:56 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/13/2025. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/08 9:48 AM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jerry L. Cunningham.(Hopkins, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/03 4:29 PM
Pursuant to[LINK:General Order 24-06] , case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (mcg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/03 8:23 AM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Parties submit a joint status report to the Court regarding the status of arbitration by February 28, 2025, or upon the completion of the agreed arbitration, whichever is sooner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/2/2024. (RPC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
9 9 misc Status Report Mon 03/04 11:15 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jerry L. Cunningham. (Hopkins, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 11/06 11:39 AM
ORDER granting7 AGREED MOTION to Stay Civil Action Pending Arbitration of Dispute . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties be referred to binding arbitration, as agreed to by the parties, and the claims between the parties be STAYED pending the outcome of arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties submit a joint status report to the Court regarding the status of arbitration by March 5, 2024, or upon the completion of the agreed arbitration, whichever is sooner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 11/6/2023. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
7 7 motion Stay Fri 11/03 4:43 PM
AGREED MOTION to Stay Civil Action Pending Arbitration of Dispute by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..(Turner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, October 23, 2023
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 10/23 9:15 AM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. to 11/7/2023. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
6 6 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 10/20 2:32 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..( Turner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 10/10 10:00 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..( Turner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/10 9:26 AM
ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/10/2023. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 10/10 10:37 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. to 10/24/2023. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/27 9:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry L. Cunningham. CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Hopkins, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/15 12:32 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. (jmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9706015.), filed by Jerry L. Cunningham.(Hopkins, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/15 12:26 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (jmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Fri 09/15 12:27 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb)
Related: [-]