California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:23-cv-04754
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Drink Nectar, Inc.
Represented By
Bradford Grice Hughes
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacob Scheibe
Represented By
Charles Christophe Weller
Charles C. Weller, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 09, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/09 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Jacob Scheibe (Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
16 16 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 12/26 3:55 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 6-1(A)) filed by Drink Nectar, Inc.. (Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 12/06 4:38 PM
Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 14 Stipulation to Set Aside Entry of Default. Case Management Conference reset for 3/12/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 12/06 2:50 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT filed by Drink Nectar, Inc..(Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Tue 10/24 2:30 PM
Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant: DRINK NECTAR, INC. dba Nectar Hydration, a Delaware corporation. Related [+](cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s)12
12 12 motion Entry of Default Tue 10/24 10:08 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Jacob Scheibe. (Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Default Entry PSP Tue 10/24 10:00 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to filed by Jacob Scheibe. (Weller, Charles) Modified on 10/24/2023 (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 10/24 11:19 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:11 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to filed by Jacob Scheibe (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
10 10 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 09/28 11:45 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference reset for 12/12/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2023. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/28/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/27 12:36 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 09/27 11:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 9:46 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacob Scheibe.. (Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/27 9:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Scheibe. Drink Nectar, Inc. served on 9/20/2023, answer due 10/11/2023. (Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/15 12:05 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 09/15 12:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Jacob Scheibe. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 10:27 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 10:23 AM
Proposed Summons. (Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 10:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Drink Nectar, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18647260.). Filed byJacob Scheibe.(Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet