California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:23-cv-04755
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Feb 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Quinoa Corporation
Represented By
Jonathan Charles Sandler
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Heyning
Represented By
Seth Adam Safier
Gutride Safier LLP
contact info
Marie Ann McCrary
Gutride Safier LLP
contact info
Hayley A. Reynolds
Gutride Safier LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, February 26, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 02/26 11:30 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL (JOINT) filed by Jennifer Heyning. (Safier, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR Fri 01/19 4:58 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 20 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Mon 01/22 8:43 AM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
20 20 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR Thu 01/18 10:23 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Quinoa Corporation filed by Quinoa Corporation.(Sandler, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
19 19 order Order Tue 01/09 11:20 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson re 18 ADR Certification of discussion of ADR options. Pursuant to ADR L.R. 2-3, the parties shall file a stipulation and proposed order by January 18, 2024 selecting an ADR process that (1) designates the specific ADR process the parties have selected, (2) specifies the time frame within which the ADR process will be completed, and (3) sets forth any other information the parties would like the Court to know. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
18 18 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 01/04 4:29 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sandler, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 12/07 6:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline to Submit ADR Certifications - 1/7/2024 Deadline to Seek Leave to Amend Pleadings - 3/7/2024 Deadline to Move for Class Certification - 8/8/2024 Deadline to File Opposition to Class Certification Motion - 10/3/2024 Deadline to File Reply in Support of Class Certification Motion - 11/29/2024 Hearing on Class Certification Motion - 1/9/2025 All further deadlines to be set after the order on class certification Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/7/2023. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/07 4:56 PM
Defendant Quinoa Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by Quinoa Corporation. (Sandler, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
15 15 misc Case Management Statement Wed 11/29 2:36 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jennifer Heyning. (Safier, Seth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/27 2:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Quinoa Corporation.. (Sandler, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 11/17 9:45 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Quinoa Corporation shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/27/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/13 5:30 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 11 Stipulation to extend time for response to complaint. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 11/10 3:55 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Further Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by More Than Thirty (30) Days (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Quinoa Corporation.(Sandler, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/24 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Ann McCrary (McCrary, Marie)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/24 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hayley A. Reynolds Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Hayley
Monday, October 16, 2023
8 8 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 10/16 4:11 PM
STIPULATION Amended Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Quinoa Corporation. (Sandler, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 10/16 4:00 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Quinoa Corporation. (Sandler, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 12:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Quinoa Corporation. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 12:02 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/15 1:02 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jennifer Heyning.. (Safier, Seth)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 11:34 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 10:56 AM
Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth)
Related: [-]
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 10:55 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18647526.). Filed byJennifer Heyning.(Safier, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet