California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:23-cv-04746
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Emelia Bardini
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
USCIS
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Changming ZHENG
93 Lisbon St
San Francisco, CA 94112
Represented By
Mei Zhou
J & T, A Law Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/26 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Zhou, Mei by Changming ZHENG (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Tue 03/26 9:54 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss Zhou, Mei filed by Changming ZHENG. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/26/2024 10:00 AM in Do Not Use To Be Determined. Responses due by 4/9/2024. Replies due by 4/16/2024. (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 11/30 1:45 PM
STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 13 Stipulation. Joint Status Report due by 5/16/2024. (kkp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/28 3:02 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; [Proposed] Order filed by Emelia Bardini, Department of Homeland Security, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 11/28 3:00 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Emelia Bardini, Department of Homeland Security, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, USCIS.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/28 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 12:33 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Changming ZHENG.. (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
9 9 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 09/26 12:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Changming ZHENG Zhou, Mei (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 09/25 10:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Emelia Bardini, Department of Homeland Security, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, USCIS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 4:39 PM
Proposed Summons. (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Mon 09/18 8:18 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/18 8:15 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201]. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:3 Proposed Summons filed by Changming ZHENG,4 Proposed Summons filed by Changming ZHENG (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 9:43 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 8:48 AM
Proposed Summons. (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 8:47 AM
Proposed Summons. (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/15 8:43 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Changming ZHENG Zhou, Mei . (Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 8:42 AM
COMPLAINT Changming Zheng against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18646606.). Filed byChangming ZHENG.(Zhou, Mei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix I 589 fingerprint,
Att: 2 Appendix passport photo page