California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Referred: Pslc Jne
Case #: 5:23-cv-04749
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, October 02, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/02 3:46 PM
DOCUMENTS by Edwin Solorzano Perez.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, September 18, 2023
utility Remark Mon 09/18 1:01 PM
Added AKA Edwin Zolorzanoperez to mailing address. Entered 9/18/2023 (ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/15 10:57 AM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Fri 09/15 10:56 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/23/2023. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Fri 09/15 10:49 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edwin Solorzano Perez. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/15 10:47 AM
NOTICE regarding last name by Edwin Solorzano Perez. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 10:45 AM
COMPLAINT against Contra Costa County Sheriff Department, West County Detention Medical Department. Filed byEdwin Solorzano Perez.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope