California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 3:23-cv-04758
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Nov 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Defendant
Danielle Lehman
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Plaintiff
Prakash Acharya
Represented By
Prerna Preshika Lal
Lal Legal Aplc
contact info
Lizbeth Fabiola Mateo Jimenez
Law Offices Of Lizbeth Mateo, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Prakash Acharya.. (Lal, Prerna)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Acharya ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18648227.) filed by Prakash Acharya. (Lal, Prerna)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Lal, Prerna)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS BY against Prakash Acharya ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18647967.). Filed byPrakash Acharya.(Lal, Prerna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Aff Asylum Receipt,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Case Status Updates,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Interview Notice