California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Pslc Hhl
Case #: 5:23-cv-04748
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Defendant
P. Garcia
Plaintiff
James Maurice Duckett
Plaintiff
Jamesha Duckett
Plaintiff
Jasmine Duckett

GPO Jan 18 2024
ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/18/2024. Dispositive Motion due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Apr 16 2024
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dispositive Motion due by 7/17/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Jul 01 2024
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Sep 16 2024
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS THIRD MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dispositive Motion due by 10/31/2024. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2024: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 31, 2024
24 24 motion Summary Judgment PSP Thu 10/31 1:38 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by P. Garcia. Responses due by 11/29/2024. Replies due by 12/13/2024.(Trenbeath, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of P. Garcia-Cortes ISO,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to C to Declaration of P. Garcia-Cortes ISO,
Att: 3 Declaration of A. Gutierrez ISO,
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of A. Gutierrez ISO,
Att: 5 Declaration of Jean M. Trenbeath ISO,
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jean M. Trenbeath ISO,
Att: 7 Defendant's Rand Warning to Plaintiff Regarding Opposing Summary Judgment,
Att: 8 Proposed Order
Monday, September 16, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 09/16 11:09 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS THIRD MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dispositive Motion due by 10/31/2024. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/16/2024) Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Document PSP Wed 09/11 8:52 AM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion filed by P. Garcia.(Trenbeath, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jean M. Trenbeath ISO,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, July 01, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 07/01 1:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Friday, June 28, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Document PSP Fri 06/28 3:11 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion filed by P. Garcia.(Trenbeath, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jean M. Trenbeath ISO,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jean M. Trenbeath ISO,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jean M. Trenbeath ISO,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 04/16 11:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dispositive Motion due by 7/17/2024. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, April 15, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Document PSP Mon 04/15 4:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion filed by P. Garcia.(Trenbeath, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 14, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/14 1:03 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by P. Garcia. (Trenbeath, Jean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/29 3:24 PM
DISREGARD - ISSUED IN ERROR. Modified on 2/29/2024 (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
15 15 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Fri 02/16 10:33 AM
Opposition to Motion by Jasmine Duckett.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, February 12, 2024
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 02/12 9:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by P. Garcia. (Trenbeath, Jean)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
utility Remark Fri 01/26 4:56 PM
Updated plaintiff's address from KVSP to current address (SVSP) as shown on most recent filing11 and new case received on 1/25/2024.(ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
utility Remark Mon 01/22 5:17 PM
Mailed complaint and orders, waivers and notice to P. Garcia. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
13 13 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines for Pro Se Prisoner Cases Fri 01/19 5:47 PM
ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/18/2024. Dispositive Motion due by 4/18/2024. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/19 5:43 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Beth Labson Freeman Granting 10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
11 11 utility Remark Tue 12/19 2:34 PM
Request Re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jasmine Duckett. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, November 03, 2023
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Fri 11/03 4:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jasmine Duckett.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, November 02, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/02 1:56 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLETE APPLICATION TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Supporting IFP Documents due by 12/4/2023. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, October 30, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/31 3:23 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jasmine Duckett.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/18 8:36 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, except for Discovery Purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(sfb, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment Tue 10/17 9:13 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 09/29 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jasmine Duckett -updated(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
utility Remark Tue 09/19 10:41 AM
Added a.k.a. for plaintiff to address field. (ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/15 12:41 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Fri 09/15 12:40 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/23/2023. (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Fri 09/15 12:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jasmine Duckett. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 12:35 PM
COMPLAINT against P. Garcia. Filed byJasmine Duckett. Consent/Declination due by 10/16/2023.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope