California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Referred: Pslc Mbi
Case #: 5:23-cv-04753
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Mar 07, 2024
Defendant
United State Air Force
Plaintiff
Gregory Scott Van Huisen

GPO Mar 07 2024
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 3/7/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 3/7/2024) cc: Order mailed to plaintiff by NMC.Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 07, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines Thu 03/07 11:08 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 3/7/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) cc: Order mailed to plaintiff by NMC. Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief PSP Wed 01/24 10:02 AM
MOTION to withdraw lawsuit filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. Responses due by 2/20/2024. Replies due by 3/5/2024.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, November 24, 2023
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief PSP Fri 11/24 12:42 PM
MOTION for perpetual injunction economical Health and Safety Code filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. Responses due by 12/22/2023. Replies due by 1/5/2024.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
10 10 misc Letter Fri 11/24 12:28 PM
Letter from Gregory Scott Van Huisen re: requesting documents. (cv, COURT STAFF) #1 Envelope) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/24/2023 (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief PSP Fri 10/27 2:00 PM
MOTION for perpetual injunction in disposition to effective counsel. filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. Responses due by 11/24/2023. Replies due by 12/8/2023.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
8 8 misc Affidavit Fri 10/27 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Gregory Scott Van Huisen.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, October 13, 2023
7 7 misc Prison Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 10/16 10:01 AM
Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 misc Statement Thu 10/12 11:16 AM
Declaratory Statement by Gregory Scott Van Huisen.(dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
5 5 misc Letter Tue 10/10 11:50 AM
Letter from Gregory Van Huisen. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP - CDCR Fri 10/06 9:59 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen, CDCR # AS8561. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, September 15, 2023
3 3 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Fri 09/15 12:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/23/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Fri 09/15 12:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against United State Air Force. Filed byGregory Scott Van Huisen.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope