California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Case #: 5:23-mc-80230
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Interested Party
Alphabet Inc.
Interested Party
Google LLC
Miscellaneous
Jun Matsumoto

GPO Oct 19 2023
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 1 Ex Parte Application. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/19/2023. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's Proposed Subpoena, Amended)(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, October 30, 2023
12 12 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 10/30 9:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jun Matsumoto (Wakabayashi, Hiromoto)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
11 11 8 pgs order Order on Ex Parte Application Thu 10/19 12:02 PM
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 1 Ex Parte Application. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/19/2023.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Proposed Subpoena, Amended
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
10 10 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/18 9:12 AM
Case reassignment to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re 9 Notice of Impending Reassignment. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 10/17 12:45 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 10/16 1:30 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google LLC. (Schwartz, Julie)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/16 1:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Schwartz, Julie)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Erin Schwartz on behalf of Google LLC (Schwartz, Julie)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 09/18 11:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jun Matsumoto (Wakabayashi, Hiromoto)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 16, 2023
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Sat 09/16 1:16 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jun Matsumoto.. (Wakabayashi, Hiromoto)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/15 2:14 PM
ORDER TO CONSENT OR DECLINE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION; re 1 Ex Parte Application. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/15/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Miscellaneous Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 1:27 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening) Fri 09/15 1:02 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION against Jun Matsumoto ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-18648350.). Filed by Jun Matsumoto.(Wakabayashi, Hiromoto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Japanese Attorney,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Translator,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 4 Proposed Order