California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-04764
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Dec 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Salesforce, Inc.
Represented By
Brian Joel Beck
Zuber Lawler LLP
contact info
Jeffrey John Zuber
Zuber Lawler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Lisbeth W. Roy
Represented By
Courtney L. Stuart-Alban
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Juan Pablo Alban
Stuart Alban Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 17, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/17 3:47 PM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Brian J. Beck. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/16 8:01 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18842066.) filed by Salesforce, Inc.. (Beck, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
19 19 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 11/15 6:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (lack of subject-matter jurisdiction and failure to state a cause of action) filed by Salesforce, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/13/2023. Replies due by 12/20/2023.(Zuber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brian J. Beck,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - EO_20-123,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - EO_20-139,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - EO_20-244,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Doctors Studio homepage, Wayback Machine 20230808,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Doctors Studio current homepage,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 11/15 2:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2023 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/15 10:15 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Monday, November 13, 2023
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 11/13 7:33 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
15 15 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/09 12:16 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Salesforce, Inc... (Zuber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 11/03 9:16 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/13/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 10/19 1:48 PM
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 9 Stipulation. Response deadline extended to 11/15/2023. If Defendant files a motion, Plaintiff's deadline to respond is extended to 12/13/2023. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 10/19 12:24 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/2/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/19 11:00 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 10/19/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 10/19 10:17 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL, Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/19/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT Correction of Complaint against Salesforce.Com.Inc. Filed byLisabeth Roy. (Alban, Juan)
Related: [-]