California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:23-cv-04758
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Nov 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Defendant
Danielle Lehman
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Plaintiff
Prakash Acharya
Represented By
Prerna Preshika Lal
Lal Legal Aplc
contact info
Lizbeth Fabiola Mateo Jimenez
Law Offices Of Lizbeth Mateo, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 06, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/06 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Prakash Acharya (Mateo Jimenez, Lizbeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
10 10 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 10/30 9:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Prakash Acharya All Defendants Served (Lal, Prerna)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
9 9 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Mon 09/18 4:44 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 09/18 3:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/18 1:15 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 3 Pro Hac Vice as to Prerna Preshika Lal. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/18 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lizbeth Fabiola Mateo Jimenez on behalf of Prakash Acharya (Mateo Jimenez, Lizbeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/15 1:09 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Prakash Acharya.. (Lal, Prerna)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 12:50 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/15 12:46 PM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Acharya ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18648227.) filed by Prakash Acharya. (Lal, Prerna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 12:34 PM
Proposed Summons. (Lal, Prerna)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS BY against Prakash Acharya ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18647967.). Filed byPrakash Acharya.(Lal, Prerna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Aff Asylum Receipt,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Case Status Updates,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Interview Notice