California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Referred: Pslc Sjt
Case #: 3:23-cv-04762
Nature of Suit560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 28, 2025
Defendant
Charles Schuyler
Defendant
H. Lomeli
Defendant
Scott Langeuin
Plaintiff
Forrest Kendrid

GPO Mar 20 2024
ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 3/20/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 3/20/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/28 12:42 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 1/28/2025. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 01/27 5:09 PM
STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by Charles Schuyler, H. Lomeli, Scott Langeuin. (Krasiev-Dvornikov, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/15 2:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING 13 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUE STAY. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 11/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2025 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 11/14 11:07 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE vacating settlement conference pursuant to dkt. #13. (glm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
13 13 motion Vacate PSP Wed 11/13 1:40 PM
MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference and Continue Stay for Sixty Days; and Declaration of Daniel Krasiev-Dvornikov filed by Charles Schuyler, H. Lomeli, Scott Langeuin. Responses due by 12/11/2024. Replies due by 12/26/2024.(Krasiev-Dvornikov, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2024
utility Remark Fri 11/08 2:52 PM
Updated plaintiff's address pursuant to letter11 .(ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Setting Settlement Conference Wed 10/02 12:44 PM
Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Settlement Conference set for 11/20/2024 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 10/2/2024. (glm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Tue 09/17 10:40 AM
Letter from Non-Party Yolanda Smith Regarding Forwarding Mail to Plaintiff Forrest Kendrid Related [+].(kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] sponse to10 Notice Regarding Plaintiff's Failure to Update Address
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, September 06, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/06 4:11 PM
NOTICE by Scott Langeuin, H. Lomeli, Charles Schuyler Defendants' Notice Regarding Plaintiff's Failure to Update Address of Record (Krasiev-Dvornikov, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Wed 06/05 9:48 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for Settlement. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Fri 05/31 1:49 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 5/30/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/08 2:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Scott Langeuin, H. Lomeli, Charles Schuyler. Service waived by Scott Langeuin waiver sent on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; H. Lomeli waiver sent on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; Charles Schuyler waiver sent on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Krasiev-Dvornikov, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Notice of CDCR Report of E-Service Waiver Received Wed 04/24 12:42 PM
NOTICE of CDCR Report of E-Service Waiver Received. This document is restricted to court users only; no NEF has been issued, and the document is not available electronically. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
utility Remark Thu 03/21 12:50 PM
Remark: CDCR E-service packet emailed to CDCR and Attorney General of the State of California per order at docket entry6 *** (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
6 6 8 pgs order Order of Service ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 03/20 9:35 AM
ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 3/20/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 03/20 9:33 AM
ORDER GRANTING 2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 3/20/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 01/29 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address and Request for case Update by Forrest Kendrid (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
3 3 motion Amend/Correct PSP Mon 09/25 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to file an Amended Complaint1 Complaint filed by Forrest Kendrid. Responses due by 10/23/2023. Replies due by 11/6/2023. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP - CDCR Fri 09/15 3:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Forrest Kendrid, CDCR # BA-4040. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Scott Langeuin, H. Lomeli, Charles Schuyler. Filed by Forrest Kendrid. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 09/18 7:36 AM
Docket sheet and Docket no.1 emailed to SVSP. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]