California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Referred: Pslc Llh
Case #: 3:23-cv-04763
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Nov 09, 2023
Defendant
Patrick Covello
Petitioner
Juan Autilano Merced Jr.

GPO Nov 09 2023
ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AS SECOND OR SUCCESSIVE PETITION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/9/2023. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 09, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 11/09 11:25 AM
ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AS SECOND OR SUCCESSIVE PETITION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/9/2023. (ls, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
6 6 misc Statement of Prisoner Account Thu 10/05 9:24 AM
Prisoner Statement of Account. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP - CDCR Tue 10/03 4:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan Autilano Merced, Jr, CDCR # D48678. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 10/03 4:11 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Juan Autilano Merced, Jr.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, September 18, 2023
utility Remark Mon 09/18 12:08 PM
Corrected petitioner's CDCR number (from A4115 to D48678) and remailed notices2 ,3 to petitioner at MCSP via CAND outgoing mail folder. (ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
3 3 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Fri 09/15 3:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/23/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form Fri 09/15 3:01 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Petition on Form due by 10/23/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Request Fri 09/15 2:59 PM
REQUEST for Notice of Appeal, Appoint Attorney by Juan Autilano Merced, Jr. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]