California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:23-cv-04768
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Emilia Bardini
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Plaintiff
Gizachew Belete
Represented By
Charles Christopher Carr
Murray Osorio, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 27, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/27 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gizachew Belete (Carr, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/25 8:53 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gizachew Belete.. (Carr, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 09/18 3:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Emilia Bardini, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Mon 09/18 3:10 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 4:26 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 3:56 PM
Proposed Summons. (Carr, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18649630.). Filed byGizachew Belete.(Carr, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Form I-589 Receipt Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Form I-589 Interview Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Emails from San Francisco Asylum Office,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet