California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:23-cv-04752
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
City of San Francisco
Plaintiff
Barbara Stuart Robinson
Barbara Stuart Robinson 4307 S Bell St 98418
Tacoma, WA 98418


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
20 20 5 pgs order Order Tue 04/23 3:19 PM
SCREENING ORDER. Order granting leave to amend by May 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 04/23/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 04/05 3:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2024 is continued to 7/18/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Ex Parte Application Fri 04/05 10:44 AM
Ex Parte Application re 17 Clerk's Notice,,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,,, Notice of Unavailability and Motion to Reschedule court date filed by Barbara Stuart Robinson. (Stuart Robinson, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 01/19 12:12 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of the fact that the defendant has not appeared, the court continues the CMC from 1/25/2024 to 4/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 01/02 8:11 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] In the future please use the following Event: Civil Events > Initial Pleadings and Service > Complaints and Other Initiating Documents > Amended Complaint . Re: 16 Amended Petition filed by Barbara Stuart Robinson (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 31, 2023
16 16 cmp Amended Petition Sun 12/31 11:50 PM
AMENDED PETITION PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Barbara Stuart Robinson. (Stuart Robinson, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 16, 2023
15 15 misc Case Management Statement Sat 12/16 2:22 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Barbara Stuart Robinson. (Stuart Robinson, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 12/06 10:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of the fact that the defendant has not appeared, the court continues the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/14/2023 to 1/25/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 10/18 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Barbara Stuart Robinson (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/04 2:53 PM
NOTICE of violation of professional ethics by Barbara Stuart Robinson (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing Thu 09/28 9:03 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 9 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
9 9 motion Permission for Electronic Case Filing Wed 09/27 3:16 PM
MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Barbara Stuart Robinson.(anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
10 10 motion Permission for Electronic Case Filing Wed 09/27 3:22 PM
See Corrected filing at Docket no.9 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Barbara Stuart Robinson. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/18 3:04 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Barbara Stuart Robinson. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/18 9:41 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/15 3:33 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER:The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 09/15/2023.(ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Self Help Flyer,
Att: 2 Pro Se Handbook
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/15 2:18 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 09/15 2:16 PM
Declaration of Barbara Stuart Robinson in Support of1 Complaint filed by Barbara Stuart Robinson. Related [+] (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 2:10 PM
Proposed Summons. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/15 2:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Barbara Stuart Robinson. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of San Francisco. Filed by Barbara Stuart Robinson. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023.(anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet