California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 5:23-cv-04759
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Bio-Botanical Research, Inc.
Plaintiff
HealthyPets, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Craig Vasquez
Vasquez Benisek & Lindgren LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren
Vasquez Benisek Lindgren LLP
contact info
Robert Stephen McArthur
Vasquez Benisek & Lindgren LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 10/04 9:04 AM
2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 09/15 2:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Bio-Botanical Research, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/15 2:56 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 09:30 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 1:55 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 1:44 PM
Proposed Summons. (Vasquez, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND UNFAIR COMPETITION (ACANDC-18648419 Already Paid $402) against Bio-Botanical Research, Inc.. Filed byHealthyPets, Inc..(Vasquez, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet