California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 3:23-cv-04767
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Detainee
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:50 AM PDT
Petitioner
John Doe
Represented By
Jessica Yucheng Zhang
Immigrant Legal Defense
contact info
Claudia Valenzuela
Immigrant Legal Defense
contact info
Alison Edith Pennington
Immigrant Legal Defense
contact info
Sarah R. Weinman
Immigrant Legal Defense
contact info
Respondent
Moises Becerra
Represented By
Molly Anne Landon Friend
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Respondent
Patrick Lechleitner
Terminated: 12/01/2023
Represented By
Molly Anne Landon Friend
Doj-Usao
contact info
Respondent
Alejandro Mayorkas
Terminated: 12/01/2023
Represented By
Molly Anne Landon Friend
Doj-Usao
contact info
Respondent
Merrick Garland
Terminated: 12/01/2023
Represented By
Molly Anne Landon Friend
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 09/18 4:48 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym for Petitioner filed by John Doe. Responses due by 9/22/2023.(Pennington, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit
4 4 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mon 09/18 4:14 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal for Petitioner filed by John Doe.(Pennington, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Addendum to verified petition for writ of habeas corpus
Friday, September 15, 2023
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 4:18 PM
Proposed Summons. (Pennington, Alison)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/15 4:15 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by John Doe for Petitioner . (Pennington, Alison)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 09/15 3:47 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Petitioner ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number ACANDC-18649568.). Filed byJohn Doe.(Pennington, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 09/15 3:56 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Category on Civil Cover Sheet should be immigration. Habeas Corpus is for Prisoner Cases. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Doe (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 09/15 4:21 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filing feefor civil case is $402. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] File application for refund for $5 in this case.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Doe (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]