New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Rochon
Case #: 1:23-cv-08192
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation
591 Main Street
New York, NY 10044
Represented By
Howard M Miller
Bond, Schoeneck & King, Pllc (gdncity)
contact info
Defendant
Shelton J Haynes
Individually c/o Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation 591 Main Street
New York, NY 10044
Represented By
Howard M Miller
Bond, Schoeneck & King, Pllc (gdncity)
contact info
Defendant
Shelton J. Haynes
in his official capacity as President and CEO of RIOC c/o Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation 591 Main Street
New York, NY 10044
Represented By
Howard M Miller
Bond, Schoeneck & King, Pllc (gdncity)
contact info
Defendant
Gretchen Robinson
Individually C/o Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation 591 Main Street
New York, NY 10044
Represented By
Howard M Miller
Bond, Schoeneck & King, Pllc (gdncity)
contact info
Defendant
Tajuna Sharpe
Individually c/o Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation 591 Main Street
New York, NY 10044
Represented By
Howard M Miller
Bond, Schoeneck & King, Pllc (gdncity)
contact info
Plaintiff
Karline Jean
420 Lexington Avenue - Suite 2811
New York, NY 10170
Represented By
Ethan York Leonard
The Law Offices Of Neal Brickman
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 09/12 10:25 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL... It is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(C) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are cancelled. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to CLOSE the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/11/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
minutes Mediation Conference Tue 08/06 4:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 8/6/2024. Mediation Status due by 9/5/2024. (sni)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 08/06 4:44 PM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 9/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Mon 07/29 11:38 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 8/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Fri 06/14 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/15/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
33 33 order Mediation Referral Order Tue 06/11 9:36 AM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/24/2024. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/10/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 06/11 9:18 AM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The requested adjournment is GRANTED. The parties shall submit a proposed case-management plan within seven days after the settlement conference is held. Defendants shall answer the Complaint within 21 days after the settlement conference is held. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/10/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/10 4:32 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants time to answer the Complaint and the time to file and enter the Case Management Plan until after the settlement conference addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Howard M. Miller dated June 10, 2024. Document filed by Shelton J Haynes, Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Gretchen Robinson, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Tajuna Sharpe, Tajuna Sharpe..(Miller, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 06/07 1:12 PM
ORDER denying22 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated on the record at the oral argument held on June 7, 2024, Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED. The parties shall jointly submit a letter regarding their interest in participating in mediation no later than June 12, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 22. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/7/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
minutes Oral Argument Fri 06/07 11:48 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon: Oral Argument held on 6/7/2024 re:22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shelton J. Haynes, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Shelton J Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Tajuna Sharpe. (aba)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
29 29 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/31 5:26 PM
ORDER. The Court shall hold oral argument on the pending motion to dismiss on June 7, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. (Oral Argument set for 6/7/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
28 28 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 01/16 10:52 AM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:22 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Shelton J Haynes, Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Gretchen Robinson, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Tajuna Sharpe, Tajuna Sharpe..(Miller, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
27 27 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/18 11:20 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:22 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/01 5:32 PM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re25 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Ethan Leonard and Howard Miller dated December 1, 2023. The requested extensions of the briefing schedule are GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 12/18/2023 Replies due by 1/19/2024.. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 12/1/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/01 12:08 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Ethan Leonard and Howard Miller dated December 1, 2023. Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
24 24 17 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 11/03 12:13 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:22 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Shelton J Haynes, Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Gretchen Robinson, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Tajuna Sharpe, Tajuna Sharpe..(Miller, Howard)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Affirmation in Support of Motion Fri 11/03 12:10 PM
AFFIRMATION of Howard M. Miller in Support re:22 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Shelton J Haynes, Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Gretchen Robinson, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Tajuna Sharpe, Tajuna Sharpe..(Miller, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Determination and Order after Investigation
22 22 motion Dismiss Fri 11/03 12:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Shelton J Haynes, Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Gretchen Robinson, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Tajuna Sharpe, Tajuna Sharpe. Responses due by 12/5/2023.(Miller, Howard)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/03 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard M Miller on behalf of Shelton J Haynes, Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Gretchen Robinson, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Tajuna Sharpe, Tajuna Sharpe..(Miller, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
20 20 order Memo Endorsement Tue 10/24 4:54 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:18 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Shelton J. Haynes, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Shelton J Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Tajuna Sharpe ENDORSEMENT The proposed briefing schedule is APPROVED. Defendants shall serve their motion to dismiss by November 4, 2023. Plaintiff shall serve its opposition papers by December 5, 2023. Defendants shall serve their reply, if any, by December 22, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 10/24/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/24 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard M Miller on behalf of Shelton J Haynes, Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Gretchen Robinson, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Tajuna Sharpe, Tajuna Sharpe..(Miller, Howard)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 10/24 10:38 AM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Shelton J Haynes, Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Gretchen Robinson, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Tajuna Sharpe, Tajuna Sharpe..(Miller, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
17 17 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 10/19 8:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Shelton J Haynes served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/27/2023; Shelton J. Haynes served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/27/2023; Gretchen Robinson served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/27/2023; Gretchen Robinson served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/27/2023; Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/27/2023; Tajuna Sharpe served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/27/2023; Tajuna Sharpe served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. Service was accepted by Howard M. Miller. Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/25 4:39 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re15 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Ethan Leonard and Howard Miller dated September 22 2023. The request is granted. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint no later than October 27, 2023. SO ORDERED. Shelton J Haynes answer due 10/27/2023; Shelton J. Haynes answer due 10/27/2023; Gretchen Robinson answer due 10/27/2023; Gretchen Robinson answer due 10/27/2023; Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation answer due 10/27/2023; Tajuna Sharpe answer due 10/27/2023; Tajuna Sharpe answer due 10/27/2023. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/25/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/22 5:04 PM
AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Ethan Leonard and Howard Miller dated September 22 2023. Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 09/22 4:30 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The request is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint no later than October 22, 2023. SO ORDERED.1 Complaint. Shelton J Haynes answer due 10/22/2023; Shelton J. Haynes answer due 10/22/2023; Gretchen Robinson answer due 10/22/2023; Gretchen Robinson answer due 10/22/2023; Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation answer due 10/22/2023; Tajuna Sharpe answer due 10/22/2023; Tajuna Sharpe answer due 10/22/2023. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/22/2023) (vfr)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Extension of Time to File Document Fri 09/22 2:23 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Ethan Leonard and Howard Miller dated September 22, 2023., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Ethan Leonard and Howard Miller dated September 22, 2023. Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
utility Add Party for Pleading Tue 09/19 12:57 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Shelton J Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Tajuna Sharpe added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint.Document filed by Karline Jean. Related document:1 Complaint..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
12 12 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 09/18 4:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 11:51 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tajuna Sharpe..(jgo)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 11:50 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shelton J. Haynes..(jgo)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 11:48 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation..(jgo)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 11:48 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gretchen Robinson..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 09/18 11:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ethan York Leonard re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, and, Tajuna Sharpe each 'individually'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 09/18 11:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Ethan York Leonard to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the Origin code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 09/18 11:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ethan York Leonard. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:451; Dollar Demand $1,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Dollar Demand has been modified to none;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 09/18 11:35 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 09/18 11:36 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 09/18 11:37 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 09/18 11:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ethan York Leonard. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Shelton J. Haynes; Gretchen Robinson; Tajuna Sharpe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/15 7:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tajuna Sharpe, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/15 7:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gretchen Robinson, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/15 7:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/15 7:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shelton J. Haynes, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/15 7:15 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/15 7:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 7:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Shelton J. Haynes, Gretchen Robinson, Roosevelt Island Operating Corporation, Tajuna Sharpe. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28297805)Document filed by Karline Jean..(Leonard, Ethan)
Related: [-]