New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:23-cv-08194
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Legoland New York LLC
Represented By
Adam Rodd
Drake Loeb PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Hanon
Represented By
Thomas Austin Brown
The Austin Brown Law Firm
contact info
David Michael Kasell
Kasell Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lego Systems, Inc.
Terminated: 10/30/2023
CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 80 STATE STREET
Albany, NY 12207
Represented By
Adam Rodd
Drake Loeb PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC
Terminated: 10/30/2023
111 EIGHTH AVENUE
New York, NY 10011
Represented By
Adam Rodd
Drake Loeb PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC
Terminated: 10/30/2023
C T CORPORATION SYSTEM 28 liberty St
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Adam Rodd
Drake Loeb PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC
Terminated: 10/30/2023
C T Corporation System 28 Liberty St.
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Adam Rodd
Drake Loeb PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 22, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/22 3:37 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Legoland New York LLC and without costs. Document filed by Legoland New York LLC. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Fri 03/22 11:07 AM
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to this action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, the above-entitled action be and the same hereby is discontinued with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/22/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/22 10:18 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Adam Rodd. RE-FILE Document No. 31 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected (Do Not Select Any Group); (2) the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
31 31 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/21 1:14 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Legoland New York LLC, Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 03/05 12:47 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised at ECF No. 29 that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within sixty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, requests to extend the deadline to reopen are unlikely to be granted. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 5.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/5/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
28 28 order Case Management Plan Fri 01/19 11:55 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER : All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Mediation to be conducted on January 19, 2024. Motions due by 2/23/2024. Deposition due by 7/8/2024. Fact Discovery due by 5/23/2024. Expert Discovery due by 7/8/2024. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and the present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. Telephone Conference set for 5/29/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Unless and until the court orders otherwise, the conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 2.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 24, 2024 is hereby CANCELED. The parties should note the deadline for their next joint letter and the date of the next pretrial conference on the previous page. Given that the parties have offered no "exceptional circumstances" for a longer-than-normal discovery schedule, the Court has adjusted the parties' proposed fact and expert discovery deadlines to accord with the Court's standard discovery schedule. The parties can and should seek any extensions for good cause by letter motion. Finally, the parties are reminded that any future joint letters must adhere strictly to the requirements listed in the relevant Orders. See, e.g., supra at 5-6. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/19/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
minutes Mediation Conference Thu 02/15 12:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 1/19/2024. Mediation Status due by 2/20/2024. (rpr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
27 27 misc Letter Thu 01/18 12:16 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Adam L. Rodd, Esq. dated January 18, 2024 re: attaching the completed Civil Case Management and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Legoland New York LLC..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Case Management and Scheduling Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/16 12:26 PM
ORDER. Counsel are reminded that, per the Court's earlier Scheduling Order, they must submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter by the Thursday prior to the upcoming conference. The parties should indicate in their joint letter whether they can do without a conference altogether. If so, the Court may enter a case management plan and scheduling order and the parties need not appear. If not (or if the Court concludes that, the parties' views notwithstanding, a conference should be held), the Court will hold the initial conference by telephone, albeit perhaps at a different time. To that end, counsel should indicate in their joint letter dates and times during the week of the conference that they would be available for a telephone conference. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, however, the conference will proceed and will do so on the date and time previously set. In the event a conference is held, the parties should join it by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/16/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
25 25 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 01/09 9:30 AM
STIPULATION SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS, The undersigned counsel stipulate and consent to the substitution of the David M. Kasell, Esq., in the above-captioned action in place and instead of Austin Brown, Esq. The Clerk is directed to terminate ECF No. 24. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:24 LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Thomas Austin Brown, New Attorney: David Kasell addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David Kasell, Counsel for Plaintiff dated 1/7/2024. filed by Jonathan Hanon., (Attorney Thomas Austin Brown terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/8/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 07, 2024
24 24 motion Substitute Attorney Sun 01/07 9:59 PM
LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Thomas Austin Brown, New Attorney: David Kasell addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David Kasell, Counsel for Plaintiff dated 1/7/2024. Document filed by Jonathan Hanon..(Kasell, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation to the substitution of the David Kasell, Esq., in place and instead of Austin Brown, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Client consent to substitution of counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit Affirmation by Austin Brown
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/19 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Michael Kasell on behalf of Jonathan Hanon..(Kasell, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 12/04 10:18 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 1/3/2024.(rpr)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Mon 12/04 10:22 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 1/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(rpr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
22 22 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/28 4:51 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:21 Letter filed by Legoland New York LLC.A ENDORSEMENT: The Court accepts counsel's apology. The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for December 20, 2023 is hereby RESCHEDULED to January 24, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 1/24/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/28/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Letter Tue 11/28 2:09 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Adam L. Rodd, Esq. dated November 28, 2023 re: the status of the Mediation. Document filed by Legoland New York LLC..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
18 18 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 11/16 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer to First Amended Complaint served on The Austin Brown Law Firm Attn: T. Austin Brown, Esq. on November 16, 2023. Document filed by Legoland New York LLC..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 11/16 4:16 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Legoland New York LLC..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 11/13 4:16 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Austin Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: LEGO LAND New York LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/09 4:15 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending13 Amended Complaint, against LEGO LAND New York, LLC.Document filed by Jonathan Hanon. Related document:13 Amended Complaint,..(Brown, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redlined version
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 11/09 3:02 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Austin Brown to RE-FILE Document No. 15 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; do not attach the red-lined version as the main document; the PDF must be titled 'First Amended Complaint' or 'Amended Complaint'; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/08 3:58 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending14 Amended Complaint, against LEGO LAND New York, LLC.Document filed by Jonathan Hanon. Related document:14 Amended Complaint,..(Brown, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 11/07 2:08 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Austin Brown to RE-FILE Document No. 13 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 11/07 2:09 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Austin Brown to RE-FILE re: Document No. 14 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Court's leave has not been granted. Re-file the pleading using the event type Second Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/06 4:47 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending13 Amended Complaint against Jonathan Hanon.Document filed by Jonathan Hanon. Related document:13 Amended Complaint..(Brown, Thomas) Modified on 11/7/2023 (vf)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/06 1:46 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Jonathan Hanon.Document filed by Jonathan Hanon. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Brown, Thomas) Modified on 11/7/2023 (vf)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/06 1:24 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's October 30, 2023 Order, ECF No. 11, Plaintiff was required to file an amended complaint pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by November 3, 2023. To date, Plaintiff has not filed any amended complaint. As a courtesy, that deadline is hereby EXTENDED, nunc pro tunc, to November 8, 2023. Counsel shall ensure that any amended complaint is filed in accordance with Rule 1(B) of the Court's Individual Rules. All other dates and deadlines, see ECF Nos. 4, 11, remain in effect ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2023.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/6/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 10/30 11:42 AM
STIPULATION, It is stipulated, pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between T. Austin Brown, Esq., counsel for plaintiff, and Adam L. Rodd, Esq. of Drake Loeb, PLLC, counsel for the named defendants Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, and Merlin Entertainments US Newco, LLC, that LEGO LAND New York, LLC be substituted as the defendant in the above-captioned lawsuit in place of Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, and Merlin Entertainments US Newco, LLC, and that the corrected caption in this lawsuit shall hereinafter be as further set forth in this Stipulation. It is further stipulated and agreed that the plaintiffs time to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with the corrected caption is November 3, 2023, and the defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint shall be November 17, 2023. Defendant LEGOLAND New York, LLC stipulates that it is the owner and operator of the underlying property at issue in this lawsuit. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, and Merlin Entertainments US Newco, LLC. The Clerk is further directed to add LEGOLAND New York LLC as a Defendant and to update the caption as indicated above. SO ORDERED. (LEGO LAND New York, LLC added. Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC, Lego Systems, Inc. and Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/30/23) (yv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 10/30 11:45 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: LEGO LAND New York, LLC answer due 11/17/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2023. (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
10 10 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 10/27 4:38 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/06 4:28 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Adam L. Rodd, Esq. dated October 6, 2023.,1 Complaint,. Application GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to terminate ECF No. 8. SO ORDERED. (Lego Systems, Inc. answer due 11/2/2023; Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC answer due 11/2/2023; Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC answer due 11/2/2023; Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC answer due 11/2/2023.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/6/23) (yv)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/06 2:05 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Adam L. Rodd, Esq. dated October 6, 2023. Document filed by Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
7 7 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 10/05 3:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on T. Austin Brown, Esq., The Austin Brown Law Firm on October 5, 2023. Document filed by Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/05 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Rodd on behalf of Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 order Mediation Referral Order Tue 09/19 12:23 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled (by separate Order to be entered today) for December 20, 2023. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647.( Mediator to be Assigned by 10/3/2023.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/19/23) (yv)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 09/19 12:10 PM
ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to this Court for all purposes Separate and apart from the foregoing, unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on December 20, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 3.D of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Co nference set for 12/20/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/19/23) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 09/18 4:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Austin Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC, jonathan hanon.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 09/18 4:08 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 09/18 4:08 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 09/18 4:09 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 16, 2023
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Sat 09/16 12:25 AM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by jonathan hanon..(Brown, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sat 09/16 12:22 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 7:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Lego Systems, Inc., Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, Merlin Entertainments US Newco LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28297886)Document filed by jonathan hanon..(Brown, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Map of location