Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Ivan D Davis
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-01231
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 11:04 AM EDT
Defendant
NTT DATA
Represented By
Lauren Ashley Champaign
Foley & Lardner Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
NTT Data Americas, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Ashley Champaign
Foley & Lardner Llp (dc)
contact info
Miranda Danielle Curtis
Foley & Lardner Llp (ma-Na)
contact info
Plaintiff
Shahdrick Samson
14321Bakerwood Place
Haymarket, VA 20169
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Madeleine Latifi
Terminated: 11/09/2023
Represented By
Lauren Ashley Champaign
Foley & Lardner Llp (dc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 26, 2024
84 84 3 pgs order Order Fri 04/26 1:27 PM
SO ORDERED re80 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by NTT Data Americas, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 4/26/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
80 80 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/25 2:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by NTT Data Americas, Inc.. (Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
83 83 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/25 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Hearing re77 MOTION to Compel filed by Shahdrick Samson. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
82 82 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/25 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Hearing re71 MOTION to Reconsider filed by Shahdrick Samson. (Sbro, ) (Main Document 82 replaced on 4/25/2024) (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
79 79 misc Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) Thu 04/25 12:14 PM
Sealed Exhibit re77 MOTION to Compel. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
78 78 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 04/25 12:12 PM
Memorandum in Support re77 MOTION to Compel filed by Shahdrick Samson.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 5,
Att: 2 Exhibit 10
77 77 motion Compel Thu 04/25 12:08 PM
MOTION to Compel filed by Shahdrick Samson.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order