Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephanie M Rose
Referred: William P Kelly
Case #: 4:23-cv-00362
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Nov 01, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 4:47 AM CDT
Defendant
Kimberly Ayotte
Defendant
Dana Camp
Defendant
Denson
Defendant
D. Gerber
Defendant
Ashley M. Graff
Defendant
A. Guerrero
Defendant
Shannon Hutchison
Defendant
Amanda LeBaron
Defendant
K. Lewis
Defendant
Teresa Smith
Defendant
Marianne Tims
Plaintiff
Benjamin M. Murphy
1438 Asbury Lane
Waterloo, IA 50701


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
6 6 order Judgment Wed 11/01 10:09 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Denson, A. Guerrero, Amanda LeBaron, Ashley M. Graff, D. Gerber, Dana Camp, K. Lewis, Kimberly Ayotte, Marianne Tims, Shannon Hutchison, Teresa Smith against Benjamin M. Murphy. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 11/1/2023. (btg)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Protective Order Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/01 8:52 AM
ORDER granting1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Case dismissed.4 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order is moot. See Order for details. Copy of this Order was mailed to Plaintiff at address listed on docket by Chambers. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 11/1/2023. (mne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
4 4 motion Protective Order Thu 10/26 10:52 AM
MOTION for Protective Order by Benjamin M. Murphy.Motions referred to William P. Kelly. Responses due by 11/9/2023. (nla)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 10/23 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT against State of Iowa, filed by Benjamin M. Murphy. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/22/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/22/2024. (btg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/20 2:38 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a complaint with the Court within 30 days or the case will be closed. See Order for details. A copy of this Order was mailed to Plaintiff at the address listed on docket by Chambers. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 9/20/2023. (mne)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/15 3:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin M Murphy. (nla)
Related: [-]