Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00119
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 5:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Zachary Fuqua (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Heather Hart Mansfield
United States Attorney'S Office (richmond)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2024 7:36 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
1 1 2 pgs CRIMINAL INFORMATION as to Zachary Fuqua count 1. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]