California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-01913
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 3:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Jorge Javier Jaramillo
The Law Office Of Jorge Jaramillo
contact info
Jesus Mosqueda
Federal Defenders
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sandor Anthony Callahan
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Oct 21 2024
JUDGMENT as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (1), Count 1 : Custody of BOP for a term of 72 months. Supervised release for 3 years. $100 Assessment. Fine Waived. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw (bjb)

Docket last updated: 09/16/2023 4:07 AM PDT
Monday, August 21, 2023
Arrest of Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (no document attached) (yem) [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez.(yem) [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez: Initial Appearance set for 8/22/2023 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jesus Mosqueda appearing for Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (Mosqueda, Jesus)Attorney Jesus Mosqueda added to party Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez(pty:dft) (stn). [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (Mosqueda, Jesus)(stn). [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez held on 8/22/2023. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez. Detention Hearing as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez held on 8/22/2023. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion granted as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention filed by Court. Bond set as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (1) No Bail. Rule 5 advisement provided. (Preliminary Hearing set for 8/31/23 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 9/19/23 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard.) (Interpreter Cynthia Herber). (CD# 8/22/2023 AHG 23-1:2:05-2:28). (Plaintiff Attorney Aaron McElhose AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Lee FD-S/A). (aje) [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/22/23. (aum) [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (aum) [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/22/23. (aje) [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sandor Anthony Callahan appearing for USA. (Callahan, Sandor)Attorney Sandor Anthony Callahan added to party USA(pty:pla) (rxc). [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
11 11 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/19/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 08/29/2023. (ggv)[3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
12 12 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez. Arraignment set for 9/18/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/18/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (tkl) [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
13 13 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez. At the request of defense counsel, Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 9/14/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (tkl) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 9/11/2023 (tkl). [3:23-mj-03048-AHG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
14 14 INDICTMENT as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez (1) count(s) 1.(rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Indictment
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez held on 9/14/2023. Defense counsel's request for new counsel - granted. Attorney Jorge Javier Jaramillo for Luis Miguel Diaz-Rodriguez appointed. Federal Defenders relieved. Time excluded 9/14/23 - 9/21/23 (CD# 9/14/2023 10:15-10:20). (Plaintiff Attorney S/A Jordan Arakawa, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jesus Mosqueda, FD). (no document attached) (tkl)
Related: [-]