California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:23-cv-04770
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Jun 06, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Nicole Yvette Blohm
Meserve, Mumper & Hughes LLP
contact info
Jonathan H. Semerjian
Meserve, Mumper & Hughes LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Minerva Brand
Represented By
Emily A. Bolt
Bolt Keenley Kim LLP
contact info
James Pieper Keenley
Bolt Keenley Kim LLP
contact info
Brian Henry Kim
Bolt Keenley Kim LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, June 06, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 06/06 4:49 PM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 21 Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 06/06 2:11 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Dismiss Entire Action Witih Prejudice filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Blohm, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/20 7:52 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report or Stipulation of Dismissal due by 6/17/2024. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
20 20 order Order Fri 05/17 4:57 PM
ORDER RE 19 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. The parties are ordered to file either a stipulation of dismissal under Rule 41 or a joint status report by June 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on May 17, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfllc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/17 4:16 PM
NOTICE by Minerva Brand NOTICE of SETTLEMENT (Keenley, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 05/14 10:10 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Requesting Joint Letter Regarding Mediation: At the Case Management Conference on 12/20/2023, the parties were ordered to file a joint letter with name of the mediator and date for mediation by 5/8/2024. The deadline has passed and a letter has not been filed. The parties are reminded to comply with deadlines set by the Court and directed to file the joint letter on this topic by 5/21/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/06 4:30 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing on Rule 52 Motions set for 11/26/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor before Judge Rita F. Lin. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
17 17 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Private ADR ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 12/20 12:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Judge Rita F. Lin: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/20/2023. Court set the following case schedule: Deadline to exchange initial disclosures is 1/12/2024. Deadline to amend the pleadings is 1/31/2024. Deadline to file Motion for Standard of Review is 7/9/2024. Close of Fact/Expert Discovery is 8/30/2024. Last day to lodge administrative record is 10/8/2024. Deadline to file Rule 52 cross-motions for judgment is 10/8/2024. Deadline to file opposition briefs to Rule 52 cross-motions for judgment is 11/5/2024. Hearing on Rule 52 motions set for 11/26/2024 at 10:00 AM. Case referred to Private ADR. Joint Letter with name of mediator and date for mediation due by 5/8/2024. Deadline to completed ADR is 7/17/2024. Digital Recording Time: 10:10-10:14. Attorney for Plaintiff: James Keenley. Attorney for Defendant: Nicole Blohm. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2023)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Wed 12/20 12:58 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
16 16 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 12/14 12:06 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Unum Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group, Other Affiliate Unum Life Insurance Company of America for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Semerjian, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/14 11:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Blohm, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
14 14 misc Joint Case Management Statement Wed 12/13 10:49 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Blohm, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
13 13 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 11/29 3:34 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Blohm, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 11/28 9:53 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Rita F. Lin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Lin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/] . Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/20/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 11/24 8:23 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 11/24/2023.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 11/24 7:14 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 11/22 1:42 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.. (Blohm, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/15 12:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Minerva Brand. Service waived by Minerva Brand waiver sent on 11/3/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Keenley, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
7 7 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/14 5:32 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Keenley, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/28 7:00 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Minerva Brand.. (Keenley, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/19 2:15 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2023 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 2:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 8:46 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 7:10 PM
Proposed Summons. (Keenley, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 7:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18650181.). Filed byMinerva Brand.(Keenley, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet