California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 3:23-cv-04771
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
FINSCHIA FOUNDATION
Represented By
Teresa Lauren Harrold Michaud
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
LINE CORPORATION
Represented By
Teresa Lauren Harrold Michaud
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
LINE NEXT INC.
Represented By
Teresa Lauren Harrold Michaud
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
LINE TECH PLUS PTE. LTD.
Represented By
Teresa Lauren Harrold Michaud
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHIA NETWORK INC.
Represented By
Mark Albert Steiner
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Robert John Nolan
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Meghan Charlene Killian
Duane Morris LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 8:36 AM
Summons Issued as to FINSCHIA FOUNDATION, LINE CORPORATION, LINE NEXT INC., LINE TECH PLUS PTE. LTD..(jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Monday, September 18, 2023
7 7 misc Patent/Trademark Report Mon 09/18 4:04 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Nolan, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 4:00 PM
Proposed Summons. (Nolan, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 3:54 PM
Proposed Summons. (Nolan, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 3:51 PM
Proposed Summons. (Nolan, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 11:17 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 8:53 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/18 10:15 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-2] Summons to LINE CORPORATION, [1-3] Summons to LINE TECH PLUS PTE. LTD., [1-4] Summons to LINE NEXT INC., [1-5] Summons to FINSCHIA FOUNDATION filed by CHIA NETWORK INC. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/18 11:15 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . AO-CAND-120 Form is missing. Please complete and file the Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark Submit your document using Other Documents> Patent/Trademark Report Re:1 Complaint, filed by CHIA NETWORK INC. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
1 1 55 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 7:12 PM
COMPLAINT against FINSCHIA FOUNDATION, LINE CORPORATION, LINE NEXT INC., LINE TECH PLUS PTE. LTD. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18650184.). Filed byCHIA NETWORK INC..(Nolan, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to LINE CORPORATION,
Att: 3 Summons to LINE TECH PLUS PTE. LTD.,
Att: 4 Summons to LINE NEXT INC.,
Att: 5 Summons to FINSCHIA FOUNDATION