California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04772
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Defendant
Raiser, LLC
Defendant
Raiser-CA, LLC
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jane Roe CL 1
Represented By
Curtis Brooks Cutter
Cutter Law PC
contact info
Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Cutter Law, P.C.
contact info
Celine Emily Cutter
Cutter Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Roe CL 1
Represented By
Curtis Brooks Cutter
Cutter Law PC
contact info
Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Cutter Law, P.C.
contact info
Celine Emily Cutter
Cutter Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Roe CL 2
Represented By
Curtis Brooks Cutter
Cutter Law PC
contact info
Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Cutter Law, P.C.
contact info
Celine Emily Cutter
Cutter Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Roe CL 3
Represented By
Curtis Brooks Cutter
Cutter Law PC
contact info
Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Cutter Law, P.C.
contact info
Celine Emily Cutter
Cutter Law PC
contact info

GPO Oct 20 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Re 3:23-md-03084-CRB. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/20/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
GPO Nov 22 2023
ORDER granting motions for leave to proceed anonymously. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2023. Associated Cases: See Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
44 44 misc Refund Status Fri 03/07 4:30 PM
Refund re39 Application for Refund Status Declined. (kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Refund Status Fri 03/07 3:42 PM
Refund re40 Application for Refund Status: Declined. (kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Refund Status Fri 03/07 3:38 PM
Refund re38 Application for Refund Status: Declined. (kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Refund Status Fri 03/07 3:23 PM
Refund re37 Application for Refund Status: Declined. (kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
40 40 misc Application for Refund Tue 03/04 2:16 PM
Application for Refund re27 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-19306793 by John Roe CL 1. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Application for Refund Tue 03/04 2:15 PM
Application for Refund re26 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-19306763 by Jane Roe CL 3. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Application for Refund Tue 03/04 2:14 PM
Application for Refund re25 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-19306695 by Jane Roe CL 2. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Application for Refund Tue 03/04 2:13 PM
Application for Refund re24 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-19306672 by Jane Roe CL 1. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
36 36 misc Refund Status Mon 03/03 5:31 PM
Refund re30 Application for Refund Status: Declined. (kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Refund Status Mon 03/03 5:15 PM
Refund re29 Application for Refund Status: Declined. (kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Refund Status Mon 03/03 5:11 PM
Refund re31 Application for Refund Status: Declined(kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Refund Status Mon 03/03 5:06 PM
Refund re32 Application for Refund Status: Declined. (kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
32 32 misc Application for Refund Tue 02/25 9:29 AM
Application for Refund re27 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-19306793 by John Roe CL 1. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Application for Refund Tue 02/25 9:28 AM
Application for Refund re26 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-19306763 by Jane Roe CL 3. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Application for Refund Tue 02/25 9:26 AM
Application for Refund re25 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-19306695 by Jane Roe CL 2. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Application for Refund Tue 02/25 9:24 AM
Application for Refund re24 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-19306672 by Jane Roe CL 1. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/30 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jane Roe CL 3 (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
27 27 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19306793.). Filed by John Roe CL 1. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
26 26 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 10:45 AM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19306763.). Filed by Jane Roe CL 3. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
25 25 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 10:37 AM
COMPLAINT Short Form against Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Raiser, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19306695.). Filed by Jane Roe CL 2. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
24 24 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Raiser, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19306672.). Filed by Jane Roe CL 1. (Domer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
23 23 3 pgs order Order Wed 11/22 2:32 PM
ORDER granting motions for leave to proceed anonymously. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2023. Associated Cases: See Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 11/21 8:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 7 Motion for Protective Order. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/24 4:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Roe CL 3, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 1, John Roe CL 1. Raiser-CA, LLC served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023. (Cutter, Curtis)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/24 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Roe CL 3, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 1, John Roe CL 1. Raiser, LLC served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023. (Cutter, Curtis)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/24 4:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Roe CL 3, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 1, John Roe CL 1. Uber Technologies, Inc. served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023. (Cutter, Curtis)
Related: [-]
18 18 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/24 11:27 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 7:41 PM
Proposed Summons. (Cutter, Curtis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 7:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Raiser, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18650243.). Filed byJane Roe CL 3, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 1, John Roe CL 1.(Cutter, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet