California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 4:23-cv-04740
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Rasier LLC
330 N. Brand Blvd Suite 700
Glendale, CA 91203
Defendant
Uber Technologies Inc.
Collins | Ford, LLP 21900 Burbank Blvd 3rd Floor
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Plaintiff
A.I.
Slater Slater Schulman LLP 8383 Wilshire Blvd 255 Beverly Hills
Beverly Hills, CA 90211
Represented By
Michael Wayne Carney
Slater Slater Schulman LLP
contact info
Lauren Aliz Welling
Slater Slater Schulman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 10/24 4:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 10/20 3:48 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by A.I... (Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/20 10:34 AM
NOTICE by A.I. OF RELATED AND TAG-ALONG ACTION TO MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION NO. 3084 (Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 10/19 5:15 PM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 11/2/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 10/03 11:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/17/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 11:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Rasier LLC, Uber Technologies Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 3:23 PM
Proposed Summons. (Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 3:12 PM
Proposed Summons. (Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/15 1:18 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/15 9:33 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 09/15 1:21 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Submit one summons for all defendants. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by A.I. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
3 3 MOTION for Protective Order filed by A.I.. Responses due by 9/28/2023. Replies due by 10/5/2023.(Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 Proposed Summons.(Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18645771.). Filed byA.I..(Welling, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet