Turner's Outdoors, Inc. v. Outdoorsmans Resale, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | P Casey Pitts |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-04735 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 1:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Outdoorsmans Resale, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Turner's Outdoors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
utility
Remark
Thu 12/14 9:05 AM
Remark: Case file electronically transferred to the US District Court of Arizona. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Remark
Thu 12/14 3:57 PM
Remark: Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in DISTRICT OF ARIZONA as case 2:23-cv-02612 (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
![]() ORDER Transferring Case to District of Arizona re: 16 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 12/13/2023. (nmc, COURT USER) |
|
28 | 28
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 12/13 10:55 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING DECEMBER 14, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() REPLY filed byOutdoorsmans Resale, Inc.. (Marion, Michael) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byTurner's Outdoors, Inc.. (Abhyanker, Raj) |
|
25 | 25
![]() ERRATA re Electronic Filing Error,22 Case Management Statement fixed case number by Turner's Outdoors, Inc.. (Abhyanker, Raj) |
|
24 | 24
![]() ERRATA re23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, Electronic Filing Error, case caption fixed by Turner's Outdoors, Inc.. (Abhyanker, Raj) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 12/01 10:44 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. Document has a different case number. [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:22 Case Management Statement filed by Turner's Outdoors, Inc. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 12/01 10:47 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. Document has a different case number.[err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Turner's Outdoors, Inc. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Abhyanker, Raj) |
|
22 | 22
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Turner's Outdoors, Inc.. (Abhyanker, Raj) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Turner's Outdoors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Turners Operations, Inc for Turner's Outdoors, Inc.. (Abhyanker, Raj) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/27 2:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing as to16 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Case previously set for 12/28/2023 is reset for 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge P. Casey Pitts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) |
|
Friday, November 24, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Marion, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael Marion. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 11/21/2023. (nmc, COURT USER) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 11/21 12:05 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Attorney Edwin Wheeler please update your ECF profile. Docket # 15 has different office address. Re:15 Notice of Appearance filed by Outdoorsmans Resale, Inc. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Outdoorsmans Resale, Inc. (Marion, Michael) |
|
16 | 16
![]() MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Outdoorsmans Resale, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/28/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Responses due by 12/4/2023. Replies due by 12/11/2023. Motion Hearing set for 12/28/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge P. Casey Pitts.(Marion, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Marion and Edwin Wheeler (Marion, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
![]() MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18855857.) filed by Outdoorsmans Resale, Inc..(Marion, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Derrick M. Davis. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 9/27/2023. (nmc, COURT USER) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Derrick M. Davis ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18681507.) filed by Turner's Outdoors, Inc..(Davis, Derrick) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Turner's Outdoors, Inc.. Service waived by Outdoorsmans Resale, Inc. waiver sent on 9/20/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Abhyanker, Raj) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 09/18 8:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge P. Casey Pitts in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 09/15/2023.(mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 09/15 2:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to Outdoorsmans Resale, Inc.. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 09/15 9:13 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |