California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 5:23-cv-04773
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Sep 20, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Plex, Inc.
Plaintiff
Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Alan Honea
Garteiser Honea PLLC
contact info
Randall Garteiser
Garteiser Honea, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 15, 2023
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/15 7:51 PM
Proposed Summons. (Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Patent/Trademark Report Fri 09/15 7:49 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark (AO 120). (cc: form mailed to register). (Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 7:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Plex, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-18650266.). Filed byRothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC.(Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Claim Charts