Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-01449
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2023
Terminated:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Gia Marina
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
Pentagon Federal Credit Union Foundation
Defendant
Westlake Services, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Myers
Represented By
George Haines
Freedom Law Firm, Llc.
contact info
Gerardo Avalos
Freedom Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 02/05/2024
Defendant
SoFi Bank, N.A., Corp.
Terminated: 10/10/2023


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
35 35 order Judgment Tue 11/05 9:01 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff, Jeffrey Myers, and against defendant, Westlake Services, Inc., in the amount of $1000.00 in statutory damages, plus $3,605.00 in attorney fees and $527.00 in costs, for a total judgment of $5,132.00. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/5/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
34 34 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 11/04 3:56 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2024 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: C. Torres ; Pla Counsel: Gerardo Avalos ; Court Reporter: Amber McClane ; Time of Hearing: 2:32 p.m. - 2:35 p.m. ; Courtroom: 6D ; The court having heard Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers's motion for default judgment against Defendant Westlake Services, Inc. on 11/4/24, and the court having entertained argument by Gerardo Avalos, Esq., who appeared on behalf of the plaintiff and considered all filings related to the motion, IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Default Judgment 32 is GRANTED for the reasons stated in the motion 32 and on the record. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff and against Westlake Services, Inc. in the amount of $1,000 in statutory damages, plus $3,605 in attorney's fees and $527 in costs, for a total judgment of $5,132, and CLOSE THIS CASE. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
minord Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 09/05 11:59 AM
NOTICE Setting Hearing on32 Motion for Default Judgment against Westlake Services, Inc.: A Motion Hearing is set on a stacked calendar for Monday, November 4, 2024 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. This hearing will be conducted in person. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
32 32 motion Motion Default Judgment Mon 08/26 1:58 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Westlake Services, Inc. by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers. Responses due by 9/9/2024.(Avalos, Gerardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey Myers,
Att: 2 Declaration of Gerardo Avalos,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Itemized Fees,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Itimized costs,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Consumer Law Survey
Thursday, August 15, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 08/16 5:05 PM
ORDER Granting ECF No.30 Stipulation for dismissal of Equifax Information Services, LLC with prejudice. IT IS ORDERED that the claims against Equifax Information Services, LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. The sole remaining defendant is Westlake Services, Inc., against whome the Clerk of Court has entered default. Plaintiff has 10 days to file a motion for default judgment or take other action to bring this case to completion. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/15/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
30 30 motion Stipulation Wed 08/14 5:32 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Equifax Information Services, LLC re1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers. (Haines, George) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/04 9:34 AM
ORDER - The order to show cause is otherwise DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
28 28 misc Response Order to Show Cause Fri 05/17 4:46 PM
RESPONSE to26 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers.(Avalos, Gerardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of George Haines,
Att: 2 Declaration of Gerardo Avalos,
Att: 3 Declaration of Joseph Benten
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
27 27 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/14 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers. with Pentagon Federal Credit Union Foundation (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Show Cause Mon 05/13 2:46 PM
ORDER - Attorneys George Haines and Gerardo Avalos are hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing, no later than May 20, 2024, why they should not be sanctioned to pay a Court fine of up to $1,000 each for violating the order at Docket No. 20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
25 25 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 05/06 6:54 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Westlake Services, Inc. re Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers22 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (WJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/23 10:26 AM
ORDER. Pending before the Court is an order to show cause why Defendant Westlake Services should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Docket No.21 . Plaintiff has now sought entry of default against Westlake Services. Docket No.22 . Plaintiff's counsel is hereby CAUTIONED that the cases they file must be advanced with appropriate diligence and, moving forward, dismissal may be warranted for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). The order to show cause is otherwise DISCHARGED and the case may continue with respect to Westlake Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
23 23 misc Response Order to Show Cause Fri 04/19 2:41 PM
RESPONSE to21 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers. (Avalos, Gerardo)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Motion Entry of Clerks Default Fri 04/19 2:37 PM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Westlake Services, Inc. by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers. Responses due by 5/3/2024. (Avalos, Gerardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Show Cause Fri 04/19 12:16 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing, no later than 5/10/2024, why Westlake Services should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KMB)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/19 12:14 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff must file dismissal papers with respect to Pentagon Federal Credit Union Foundation by 5/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
19 19 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/05 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers. with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 01/12 11:39 AM
STATUS REPORT with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 12/21 11:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Denying16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The scheduling order in this case will be as follows: Discovery due by 5/13/2024. Motions due by 6/12/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 12/20 8:38 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
15 15 notice Notice Other Mon 11/13 3:06 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Jeffrey Myers re1 Complaint,,.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 11/13 3:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC added.. (Marina, Gia)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/13 2:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/23/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/28/2023.(Marina, Gia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
12 12 notice Notice Other Tue 10/31 2:11 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Pentagon Federal Credit Union Foundation by Jeffrey Myers re1 Complaint,,.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/11 11:00 AM
Party SoFi Bank, N.A., Corp. terminated per10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Tue 10/10 2:17 PM
ORDER Granting9 Motion to Extend Time re1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 11/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/10 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Jeffrey Myers. with SoFi Bank, N.A., Corp. . (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
9 9 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 10/09 11:48 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to answer re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 10/23/2023. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/06 8:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Myers re1 Complaint,,. SoFi Bank, N.A., Corp. served on 9/22/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/05 2:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Myers re1 Complaint,,. Pentagon Federal Credit Union Foundation served on 9/21/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/05 2:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Myers re1 Complaint,,. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/21/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/05 2:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Myers re1 Complaint,,. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/21/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/29 10:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Myers re1 Complaint,,. Westlake Services, Inc. served on 9/22/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 9:04 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Pentagon Federal Credit Union Foundation, SoFi Bank, N.A., Corp., Westlake Services, Inc. re1 Complaint. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Equifax,
Att: 2 Summons Westlake,
Att: 3 Summons PenFed CU,
Att: 4 Summons SoFi Bank
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/19 8:46 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 16, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Sat 09/16 1:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jeffrey Myers. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Avalos, Gerardo)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 09/16 1:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7429077) by Jeffrey Myers. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/26/2023. Proof of service due by 12/15/2023. (Avalos, Gerardo) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Experian,
Att: 3 Summons Equifax,
Att: 4 Summons Westlake,
Att: 5 Summons PenFed CU,
Att: 6 Summons SoFi Bank