Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01450
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2023
Re-opened:Nov 21, 2023
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Gia Marina
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mariano Garcera
Represented By
Gerardo Avalos
Freedom Law Firm
contact info
George Haines
Freedom Law Firm, Llc.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Capital One Bank, N.A.
Terminated: 11/22/2023
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 01/09/2024
Defendant
First Premier Bank
Terminated: 09/27/2023
Defendant
Opportunity Financial, LLC
Terminated: 10/23/2023
Defendant
U.S. Bank, N.A.
Terminated: 01/17/2024
Represented By
Tyson E Hafen
Duane Morris LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/04 10:45 AM
ORDER granting33 Stipulation for Dismissal of Equifax Information Services, LLC with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
33 33 motion Stipulation Mon 06/03 12:34 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Equifax Information Services, LLC re1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Mariano Garcera. (Haines, George) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
32 32 notice Notice Other Thu 04/04 5:00 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Equifax Information Services LLC by Mariano Garcera re1 Complaint,,. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
31 31 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/05 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Mariano Garcera. with U.S. Bank, N.A. . (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
30 30 misc Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ Thu 01/25 10:32 AM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court regarding assignment of case to Magistrate Judge. (The attached document is restricted to the Office of the Clerk and is not viewable. The filer of this document is also restricted. See General Orders 2023-11 and 2023-12.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Tue 01/23 1:20 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
28 28 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 01/23 1:19 PM
ORDER granting27 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/5/2024. Motions due by 7/5/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
27 27 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 01/19 1:10 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mariano Garcera.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
26 26 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Tue 01/16 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Mariano Garcera. with U.S. Bank, N.A. . (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
misc Docket Notes Tue 01/09 8:32 AM
Experian Information Solutions, Inc. terminated per25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
25 25 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/08 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Mariano Garcera. with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
24 24 notice Notice Other Wed 12/13 10:28 AM
NOTICE of settlement with U.S. Bank, N.A. by Mariano Garcera re1 Complaint,,.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
23 23 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 12/08 3:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC added.. (Marina, Gia)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/08 3:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/18/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/22/2024.(Marina, Gia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 11/28 2:58 PM
ORDER granting20 Stipulation for Extension of Time for U.S. Bank N.A., to Respond to Complaint. U.S. Bank, N.A. answer due 1/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
20 20 motion Stipulation Mon 11/27 9:44 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for U.S. Bank N.A. to Respond to Complaint re1 Complaint,, by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Hafen, Tyson) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
19 19 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/21 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Mariano Garcera. with Capital One Bank, N.A. . (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/22 8:59 AM
ERROR: Entered in error be Clerk's Office. Case reopened Civil Case Terminated per 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. (CAH)
Related: [-]
utility Case Reopened Wed 11/22 10:02 AM
Case Reopened. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
18 18 notice Notice Other Mon 11/13 3:11 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Mariano Garcera re1 Complaint,,.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Thu 11/09 11:10 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Extend Time FOR DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC TO FILE ANSWER. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 12/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Wed 11/08 8:50 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to answer re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 11/22/2023. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Parties Mon 10/23 8:35 AM
Opportunity Financial, LLC terminated per15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
15 15 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/20 8:45 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Mariano Garcera. with Opportunity Financial, LLC . (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Tue 10/10 11:50 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Extend Time re1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 11/9/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 10/10 11:47 AM
ORDER granting11 Stipulation for Extension of Time re1 Complaint. U.S. Bank, N.A. answer due 11/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
12 12 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 10/09 11:50 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to answer re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 10/23/2023. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation Fri 10/06 12:21 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for U.S. Bank N.A. to Respond to Complaint re1 Complaint,, by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Hafen, Tyson) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/05 6:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mariano Garcera re1 Complaint,,. Opportunity Financial, LLC served on 9/20/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/05 6:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mariano Garcera re1 Complaint,,. U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 9/20/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/05 5:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mariano Garcera re1 Complaint,,. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/19/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/05 5:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mariano Garcera re1 Complaint,,. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/19/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/05 5:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mariano Garcera re1 Complaint,,. Capital One Bank, N.A. served on 9/22/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Parties Wed 09/27 11:37 AM
Party First Premier Bank terminated. (CT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
5 5 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/26 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Mariano Garcera. of First Premier Bank . (Avalos, Gerardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
order Standing Order Tue 09/19 3:31 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 10:58 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capital One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., First Premier Bank, Opportunity Financial, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A. re1 Complaint. (CAH)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 09/18 10:29 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 16, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Sat 09/16 1:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mariano Garcera. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Avalos, Gerardo)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 09/16 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7429082) by Mariano Garcera. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/26/2023. Proof of service due by 12/15/2023. (Avalos, Gerardo) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Experian,
Att: 3 Summons Equifax,
Att: 4 Summons Capital One,
Att: 5 Summons First premier,
Att: 6 Summons Opportunity Financial,
Att: 7 Summons U.S. Bank