Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-01424
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 3:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Keyon J'Adarte Green (1)
Represented By
Kathryn E Sheldon
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Andrew Tysen Duva
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/18/2023 3:48 AM EDT
Friday, September 15, 2023
1 1 Arrest pursuant to Rule 32.1 of Keyon J'Adarte Green from the District of South Carolina. (SHS)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson: INITIAL APPEARANCE in Rule 32.1 proceedings held on 9/15/2023 as to Keyon J'Adarte Green from the District of South Carolina. Appearance entered by Kathryn E Sheldon for Keyon J'Adarte Green on behalf of defendant. (Digital) (SHS)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Keyon J'Adarte Green. (SHS)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit (FILED IN OPEN COURT) by Keyon J'Adarte Green. (SHS)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel Kathryn E Sheldon for Keyon J'Adarte Green appointed as to Keyon J'Adarte Green (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/15/2023. (SHS)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Keyon J'Adarte Green. (SHS)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Rule 32.1 hearing (EXECUTED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT) by Keyon J'Adarte Green. (SHS)
Related: [-]