Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:23-cv-00955
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Case in other court:236th District Court, Tarrant County, Texas, 236-343098-23
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By
Claudine G Jackson
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Andrea W. Paris
Brackett & Ellis PC
contact info
Maritza Yanith Sanchez
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon L Yeager
Represented By
Christopher Charles Antone
Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation Wed 08/07 8:47 AM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Brandon L Yeager. (Goodman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Wed 08/07 9:21 AM
Civil Case Terminated per20 Stipulation of Dismissal. (jnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document Tue 07/09 4:46 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the18 Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. All other deadlines remain the same. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties should file the appropriate settlement papers no later than August 7, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/9/2024) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 07/08 10:10 AM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Papers filed by Brandon L Yeager (Goodman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Mon 06/10 11:43 AM
ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file the appropriate settlement papers no later than July 8, 2024. All existing deadlines are hereby STAYED pending the filing of appropriate settlement papers. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/10/2024) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/07 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Brandon L Yeager (Goodman, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/07 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert E Goodman, Jr on behalf of Brandon L Yeager. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Goodman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/22 9:16 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline (ECF No.13 ), filed April 19, 2024. The Parties current discovery deadline is June 5, 2024. ECF No.7 . The Parties seek additional time to conduct the necessary discovery. Finding good cause therein, the Court ORDERS that the Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. All other deadlines remain the same. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties should complete discovery no later than July 19, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/22/2024) (sre)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/19 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Agreement Extending Discovery Deadline re:7 Scheduling Order,, filed by Brandon L Yeager (Antone, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/16 2:56 PM
ORDER granting11 : Parties seek additional time to conduct the necessary discovery, consider and agree on a mediator, and adequately prepare for mediation. Finding good cause therein, the Court ORDERS that the Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties should mediate no later than June 6, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/16/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/15 7:48 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Time mediation deadline filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Jackson, Claudine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/20 7:13 PM
NOTICE of Compliance filed by Brandon L Yeager (Antone, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 02/14 9:33 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel. Andrea W. Paris terminated. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/14/2024) (bdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
8 8 motion Substitute Attorney Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/08 11:32 AM
Agreed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Maritza Yanith Sanchez,Maritza Yanith Sanchez for Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Motion, Agreed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrea W. Paris () filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLCAttorney Maritza Yanith Sanchez added to party Lowe's Home Centers LLC(pty:dft) (Sanchez, Maritza)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
7 7 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/07 2:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning November 12, 2024. Counsel and the parties shall be ready for trial on two days' notice at any time during this four-week period. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2023. Motions due by 7/15/2024. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/6/2024. Discovery due by 6/5/2024. Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/7/2023) (tjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
6 6 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Fri 11/03 10:28 AM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Jackson, Claudine)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
5 5 9 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Fri 10/06 1:37 PM
MEET AND CONFER ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 3, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/6/2023) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/25 9:23 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Jackson, Claudine)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
3 3 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Mon 09/18 10:16 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 09/18 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Jackson, Claudine)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 09/18 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-14038645) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jackson, Claudine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 9 Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Cover Sheet Supplement