California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:23-cv-04776
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:14 PM PDT
Defendant
Medicredit Inc.
Represented By
Megan Dana Meadows
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Scott J. Dickenson
Spencer Fane
contact info
Theresa C. Becerra
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jude Furr
Represented By
Rachel Elizabeth Kaufman
Kaufman P.A.
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2024
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 3/29/2024. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 29, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order Transferring Case - - Out of District ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 03/29 10:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 3/29/2024. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
38 38 oth_sup Statement of Non-Opposition Fri 03/29 7:54 AM
Statement of Non-Opposition re34 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byJude Furr. Related [+] (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-] 34
utility Remark Fri 03/29 10:54 AM
*** Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri, Eastern Division as case 4:24-cv-00484*** (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
37 37 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 03/22 1:40 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 3/29/2024. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/22 9:58 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re34 MOTION to Transfer Case for Extension of Time filed by Jude Furr. (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
35 35 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 03/08 2:42 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re34 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byMedicredit Inc.. Related [+] (Becerra, Theresa)
Related: [-] 34
34 34 motion Transfer Case Fri 03/08 2:40 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Medicredit Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Responses due by 3/22/2024. Replies due by 3/29/2024.(Becerra, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 22, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/22 3:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 2/22/2024. Add Parties / Amended Pleadings due by 3/22/2024. Mediation due by 5/22/2024. Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/26/2024. Plaintiff's Initial Expert Disclosure(s) and Report(s) due by 9/12/2024. Defendant's Initial Expert Disclosure(s) and Report(s) due by 10/3/2024. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert(s) and Provide Rebuttal Expert Report(s) due by 10/24/2024. Close of Expert Discovery due by 11/15/2024. Class Certification and Daubert Motions due by 12/19/2024. Opposition due by 1/9/2025. Reply due by 1/23/2025. Class Certification and Daubert Motions Hearing set for 2/20/2025 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
32 32 minutes Case Management Conference - Further Thu 02/22 11:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/22/2024. Written Pretrial Scheduling Order to follow. Total Time in Court: 14 minutes. Court Reporter: Recorded via Zoom. Plaintiff Attorney: Rachel Kaufman. Defendant Attorney: Megan Meadows. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/22/2024)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
31 31 misc Joint Case Management Statement Mon 02/05 10:53 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jude Furr. (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
30 30 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/04 3:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/4/2024. Parties to file status report due by 2/5/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/ Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at amocrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 20, 2024 at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Recorded via Zoom. Plaintiff Attorney: Rachel Kaufman. Defendant Attorney: Megan Meadows. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/4/2024)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 12/27 2:22 PM
Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at amocrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 2, 2024 at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Wed 12/27 2:20 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting as Modified 27 Administrative Motion Stipulation RE: Virtual Appearance. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Wed 12/27 7:27 AM
Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Appear Virtually for Case Management Conference re 10 Clerk's Notice,,, filed by Jude Furr. Responses due by 1/2/2024.(Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
26 26 misc Joint Case Management Statement Wed 12/27 7:21 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jude Furr. (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
25 25 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 12/27 7:19 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 12/27 7:18 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jude Furr (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/21 3:44 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Scott J. Dickenson. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/21 3:42 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Megan D. Meadows. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/21 8:58 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Scott Dickenson ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-18961162.) filed by Medicredit Inc..(Dickenson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/21 8:49 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Megan Meadows ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-18960935.) filed by Medicredit Inc..(Meadows, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, December 15, 2023
19 19 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Fri 12/15 6:49 PM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jfk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
18 18 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/04 4:27 PM
Defendant Medicredit, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint -Class Action by Medicredit Inc.. (Becerra, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
17 17 order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 11/21 11:24 AM
ORDER re 15 : in light of Plaintiff's amended complaint 16 , the Court hereby TERMINATES Defendant's Motion to Strike Class Allegations as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/20 10:47 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Medicredit Inc.. Filed by Jude Furr. (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
15 15 motion Strike Mon 11/06 6:20 PM
MOTION to Strike Class Allegations filed by Medicredit Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Chambers before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Responses due by 11/20/2023. Replies due by 11/27/2023. (Becerra, Theresa)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Proposed Order Mon 11/06 6:08 PM
Proposed Order Granting Defendant Medicredit, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Class Allegations by Medicredit Inc.. (Becerra, Theresa)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/06 6:00 PM
NOTICE by Medicredit Inc. Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Class Allegations (Becerra, Theresa)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/06 5:56 PM
Defendant Medicredit, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Medicredit Inc.. (Becerra, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 10/16 9:22 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Medicredit Inc..(Becerra, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Re: Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 10/04 10:39 AM
Clerk's Notice Scheduling Case Management Conference. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] . Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/02 1:23 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 10/02/2023.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 10/02 11:51 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/02 9:59 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jude Furr.. (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/29 12:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jude Furr. Medicredit Inc. served on 9/25/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 2:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Medicredit Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 2:02 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 1:06 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 10:29 AM
Proposed Summons. (Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against Medicredit Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18652127.). Filed byJude Furr.(Kaufman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet