Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Timothy J Corrigan
Referred: Samuel J Horovitz
Case #: 3:23-cv-01097
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Discover Financial Services
Represented By
Sara Lauren Solano
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
David Alan Elliott
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rheya A. Jackson
10252 Pine Breeze Road West
Jacksonville, FL 32257


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
48 48 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 08/07 5:50 PM
ORDER granting in part 14 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Complaint; denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Strike the Motion to Compel Arbitration, 21 Motion for Summary Judgment, 25 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Exhibit re Motion to Strike, 26 Motion for Leave to File Adequate Response, 27 Amended Motion for Leave to File Adequate Response, 42 Motion for Oral Argument, and 43 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 35 the Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Mediator, 36 the Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines, and 38 the Motion for Leave to File Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay Discovery. The case is stayed and administratively closed while the parties submit to arbitration. See Order for details.Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/7/2024. (JCD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Thu 08/08 3:41 PM
Case Stayed. (KME)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
47 47 adr Mediation report Thu 07/11 4:39 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on July 9, 2024. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Grippa, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
46 46 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 07/09 2:59 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on July 9, 2024 at 1 PM before Jennifer B. Grippa. (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
45 45 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/09 12:39 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz. New case number: 3:23-cv-1097-TJC-SJH. Magistrate Judge J. B. Toomey no longer assigned to the case. (MDC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
44 44 2 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Thu 06/27 10:30 AM
ORDER directing the parties to attend mediation no later than 8/16/2024 with Jennifer Grippa as mediator. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/27/2024. (JCD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
43 43 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/31 3:56 PM
AMENDED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
42 42 motion Hearing / Conference Fri 05/31 3:53 PM
MOTION for Oral Argument by Rheya A. Jackson. (ELM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
41 41 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/19 4:16 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Discover Financial Services filed by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N,
Att: 16 Exhibit O
40 40 misc Supplement Tue 03/19 3:53 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL Certification Statement for38 MOTION for Leave to File Response in Opposition to Motion by Rheya A. Jackson. (ELM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/14 3:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re36 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Case (Doc.14) filed by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
38 38 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document Thu 03/14 3:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Response in Opposition to36 Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Case by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Monday, March 04, 2024
37 37 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 03/04 11:56 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Amend Pleading and 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the "Amended Complaint for a Civil Case Alleging Breach of Contract." Plaintiff shall file her Amended Complaint and supplement as a single document on or before March 18, 2024. Defendant need not respond to the Amended Complaint since it has already filed a Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. 14). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 3/4/2024. (CSE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
36 36 motion Stay Discovery Tue 02/27 2:51 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Case (Doc.14) by Discover Financial Services. (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
35 35 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/09 3:24 PM
MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Mediator - titled "Notice of Mediation" by Rheya A. Jackson. (ELM)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Fri 02/09 3:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Amend32 MOTION to Supplement31 Amended Complaint, by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, February 02, 2024
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/02 12:01 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 MOTION to Supplement31 Amended Complaint, filed by Discover Financial Services. (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
32 32 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 01/22 4:31 PM
MOTION to Supplement31 Amended Complaint, by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
31 31 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/22 4:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Discover Financial Services filed by Rheya A. Jackson. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order to Strike Wed 12/27 2:23 PM
ORDER striking 29 Plaintiff's Supplemental Initial Disclosures. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/27/2023. (CSE)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
29 29 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/22 3:52 PM
Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
28 28 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 12/12 11:08 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2024; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 4/5/2024; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 4/19/2024; Discovery due by 5/24/2024; Dispositive motions due by 5/31/2024; Pretrial statement due by 10/17/2024; All other motions due by 10/17/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan; Bench Trial set for trial term commencing 11/4/2024 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/6/2023. (TPL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
27 27 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document Mon 12/04 10:58 AM
AMENDED MOTION for Leave to File Adequate Response; re14 Motion to Compel by Rheya A. Jackson.(BGR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Response
Friday, December 01, 2023
26 26 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document Fri 12/01 4:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Adequate Response; re14 Motion to Compel by Rheya A. Jackson.(BGR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Response
Monday, November 27, 2023
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/27 6:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Strike14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Complaint and Incorprated Memo of Law ,21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Discover Financial Services. (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
25 25 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Tue 11/28 10:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit; re20 MOTION to Strike14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Complaint and Incorprated Memo of Law by Rheya A. Jackson.(BGR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit J,
Att: 13 Exhibit K,
Att: 14 Exhibit L,
Att: 15 Exhibit M
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
23 23 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/15 10:45 AM
ORDER striking 22 Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 11/15/2023. (KLA)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/14 2:32 PM
Initial Disclosure by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Mon 11/13 4:25 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Rheya A. Jackson. (ELM)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Strike Mon 11/13 4:21 PM
MOTION to Strike14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memo of Law by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M
Thursday, November 09, 2023
19 19 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Thu 11/09 4:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Case Management Report After Time Specific In Local Rule 3.02(b). The proposed Uniform Case Management Report attached to 18 Plaintiff's motion is deemed filed. The Court will enter a Case Management and Scheduling Order scheduling the deadlines and settings. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/9/2023. (KSM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
18 18 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document Fri 11/03 2:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Case Management Report After Time Specified in Local Rule 3.02(b) by Rheya A. Jackson.(BGR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Case Management Report
Thursday, October 26, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/27 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporate Memorandum of Law by Rheya A. Jackson(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/27 2:07 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL disclosure statement by Rheya A. Jackson.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of change of address Wed 10/25 3:03 PM
NOTICE of change of contact information by Rheya A. Jackson(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Friday, October 20, 2023
14 14 motion Compel Fri 10/20 2:28 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Complaint and Incorprated Memo of Law by Discover Financial Services.(Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
13 13 6 pgs order Order Tue 10/10 2:46 PM
ORDER advising pro se Plaintiff of some rules with which she must comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/10/2023. (JDM)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/10 9:48 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including October 20, 2023 to respond to the Complaint for A Civil Case Alleging Breach of Contract 1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/10/2023. (TSP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/09 8:50 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Discover Financial Services. (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 09/22 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AMM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of appearance Wed 09/20 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Alan Elliott on behalf of Discover Financial Services (Elliott, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/20 9:09 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Discover Financial Services. (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 09/20 9:08 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Discover Financial Services. Related case(s): No (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 09/20 9:08 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Sara Lauren Solano on behalf of Discover Financial Services. Lead Counsel: Sara L. Solano. (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of appearance Wed 09/20 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Lauren Solano on behalf of Discover Financial Services (Solano, Sara)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
4 4 service Summons returned executed Mon 09/18 2:35 PM
RETURN of service executed on 9/18/2023 by Rheya A. Jackson as to Discover Financial Services. (BGR)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/18 12:54 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 by Rheya A. Jackson. (BGR)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons issued Mon 09/18 12:48 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Discover Financial Services. (Provided certified copy in person) (BGR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Discover Financial Services, Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 36776, filed by Rheya A. Jackson.(BGR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet