MPL Communications Limited v. The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Raag Singhal |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-61792 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
kaiteez.com
|
|
Defendant
wogifts.com
|
|
Defendant
vuccie.com
|
|
Defendant
tidivy.com
|
|
Defendant
teenavi.com
|
|
Defendant
teefoxstore.com
|
|
Defendant
teedrab.com
|
|
Defendant
shirt-trends.com
|
|
Defendant
rancorner.com
|
|
Defendant
milotees.com
|
|
Defendant
krusteez.com
|
|
Defendant
jollyfamilygifts.com
|
|
Defendant
hersmiles.co
|
|
Defendant
heavenshirt.com
|
|
Defendant
happyinktee.com
|
|
Defendant
ecomhao.com
|
|
Defendant
bestteestore.net
|
|
Defendant
beeteeshop.com
|
|
Defendant
The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations
|
|
Plaintiff
MPL Communications Limited
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
cassivalen.com
Terminated: 02/02/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
1
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Tue 04/23 10:39 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (AO Form and Order sent) (ebz) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
43 | 43
order
Judgment - Default Permanent Injunction
Tue 04/23 9:52 AM
DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of MPL Communications Limited against The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations, beeteeshop.com, bestteestore.net, ecomhao.com, happyinktee.com, heavenshirt.com, hersmiles.co, jollyfamilygifts.com, kaiteez.com, krusteez.com, milotees.com, shirt-trends.com, teedrab.com, teefoxstore.com, teenavi.com, tidivy.com, vuccie.com, wogifts.com. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction
Fri 04/19 10:56 AM
CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT NUMBER 16 (rancorner.com.com) re Motion for Entry of Consent Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Number 16, DE39 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) Modified text on 4/19/2024 (ebz) |
|
41 | 41
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 04/19 10:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT re40 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 04/18 1:57 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by MPL Communications Limited.(Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Richard Ewbank in Support Thereof, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Richard Ewbank, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support Thereof, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Approve Consent Judgment Permanent Injunction
Mon 04/15 11:33 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment ( Responses due by 4/29/2024.), MOTION for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Number 16 by MPL Communications Limited.(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Number 16, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Consent as to Defendant Number 16 | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Thu 03/28 4:08 PM
ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction
Thu 02/01 1:59 PM
CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT NUMBER 2. ORDER granting36 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; granting36 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Approve Consent Judgment Permanent Injunction
Tue 01/16 11:35 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment ( Responses due by 1/30/2024.), MOTION for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Number 2 by MPL Communications Limited.(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Number 2 | ||
Wednesday, December 27, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Settlement - aty
Wed 12/27 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Settlement With Defendant Number 2 by MPL Communications Limited (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
order
Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM
Thu 12/07 10:40 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations - Motions Terminated:33 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 12/7/2023. (ebz) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Clerk's Entry of Default
Wed 12/06 9:12 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations, beeteeshop.com, bestteestore.net, ecomhao.com, happyinktee.com, heavenshirt.com, hersmiles.co, jollyfamilygifts.com, kaiteez.com, krusteez.com, milotees.com, rancorner.com, shirt-trends.com, teedrab.com, teefoxstore.com, teenavi.com, tidivy.com, vuccie.com, wogifts.com by MPL Communications Limited.(Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 12/06 9:08 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MPL Communications Limited. beeteeshop.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; bestteestore.net served on 10/6/2023, response/answer due 10/27/2023; cassivalen.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 12/27/2023; ecomhao.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; happyinktee.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; heavenshirt.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; hersmiles.co served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; jollyfamilygifts.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; kaiteez.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; krusteez.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; milotees.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; rancorner.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; shirt-trends.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; teedrab.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; teefoxstore.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; teenavi.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; tidivy.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; vuccie.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023; wogifts.com served on 10/5/2023, response/answer due 10/26/2023.(Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service | ||
31 | 31
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/06 9:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MPL Communications Limited re24 Order on Ex Parte Motion upon Defendant via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
30 | 30
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/06 9:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MPL Communications Limited re24 Order on Ex Parte Motion upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/06 9:01 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE by MPL Communications Limited re24 Order on Ex Parte Motion upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice | ||
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 12/05 2:41 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document by cassivalen.com. Response/Answer due 12/27/2023. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/5/2023. (pb00) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 12/05 2:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by cassivalen.com. Attorney Darren Adam Heitner added to party cassivalen.com(pty:dft).(Heitner, Darren) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 11/27 2:17 PM
ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURE. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall submit a motion for entry of Clerk's default no later than December 6, 2023. Plaintiff's failure to file the motion for entry of Clerk's default within the specified time may result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. If the parties agreed to an extension of time to respond, Defendants shall file an unopposed motion requesting additional time. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Thu 10/05 4:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by MPL Communications Limited.(Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint Certificates of Registration for the Paul McCartney Trademarks | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
15
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Motion
Thu 10/05 11:09 AM
ORDER granting7 Application for Entry of Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/4/2023. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
23 | 23
minutes
Evidentiary Hearing
Wed 10/04 3:01 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Evidentiary Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 10/4/2023. No appearances for Defendants. Motion granted; order forthcoming. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pb00) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/03 2:06 PM
NOTICE by MPL Communications Limited of Identification of Additional Financial Account for Defendant Number 2 (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/03 1:51 PM
NOTICE by MPL Communications Limited of E-mail Inquiries Received from Certain Defendants in Connection with Asset Restraint and Service (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of E-Mail Inquiries | ||
20 | 20
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/03 10:19 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MPL Communications Limited re10 Order on Ex Parte Motion,1 Complaint,15 Motion to Unseal Case,7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
19 | 19
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/03 10:17 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MPL Communications Limited re8 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ,10 Order on Ex Parte Motion,5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4,14 Notice (Other),9 Sealed Document,3 Form AO 120/121,13 Sealed Document,1 Complaint,4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,15 Motion to Unseal Case,12 Sealed Document, 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment,6 Order on Motion to Seal,11 Order on Ex Parte Motion,7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/03 10:13 AM
Plaintiff's NOTICE by MPL Communications Limited re10 Order on Ex Parte Motion,1 Complaint,7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice | ||
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Compliance
Thu 09/28 5:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by unsealing documents per DE16 Order. (kpe) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Unseal Case
Thu 09/28 5:11 PM
ORDER to Unseal. Order granting15 Motion to Unseal. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to unseal all docket entries in this case and return those portions of the Court file to the public records. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Unseal Case
Thu 09/28 2:43 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION To Unseal by MPL Communications Limited.(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/22 8:48 AM
NOTICE of Filing Bond by MPL Communications Limited (ls) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by MPL Communications Limited. (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MPL Communications Limited (Gaffigan, Stephen) | |
3 | 3 1 pgs FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (nan) | |
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16924775, filed by MPL Communications Limited.(Gaffigan, Stephen) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint Certificates of Registration for the Paul McCartney Trademarks |